Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0963108

EP0963108 - Motion vector detection circuit enabling high-speed search of motion vector [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  23.04.2004
Database last updated on 11.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip25.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 27.08.2008  [2008/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NEC Corporation
7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-8001 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1999/49]For all designated states
NEC CORPORATION
7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kametani, Jun
c/o NEC Corporation, 7-1, Shiba 5-chome
Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP
[1999/49]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/35]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
Former [1999/49]VOSSIUS & PARTNER
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date99109332.931.05.1999
[1999/49]
Priority number, dateJP1998015126501.06.1998         Original published format: JP 15126598
[1999/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0963108
Date:08.12.1999
Language:EN
[1999/49]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0963108
Date:12.07.2000
[2000/28]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.05.2000
ClassificationInternational:H04N5/14
[1999/49]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   NL [2001/12]
Former [1999/49]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Bewegungsvektordetektionsschaltung zur Hochgeschwindigkeits-Bewegungsvektorsuche[1999/49]
English:Motion vector detection circuit enabling high-speed search of motion vector[1999/49]
French:Circuit de détection du vecteur de mouvement permettant une recherche très rapide du vecteur de mouvement[1999/49]
Examination procedure12.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/02]
02.12.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/24]
13.01.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2004/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
31.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.200305   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[E]JPH11196421  ;
 [X]JPH01295379  ;
 [A]US5400087  (URAMOTO SHINICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1,9 * abstract *;
 [A]US5416522  (IGARASHI KATSUJI [JP]) [A] 1,9 * column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 8 * * column 4, line 43 - column 5, line 10 * * column 6, line 25 - column 7, line 38; figure 5 *;
 [A]JPH07203457  ;
 [A]US5696836  (YOSHINO TOSHIAKI [US], et al) [A] 1,9 * the whole document *
 [E]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19991029), vol. 1999, no. 12, [E] 1,9 * abstract *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900216), vol. 014, no. 084, Database accession no. (P - 1007), [X] 1,9 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19951226), vol. 1995, no. 11, [A] 1,9 * abstract *