Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0962442

EP0962442 - Process for producing aromatic carboxylic acid [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.07.2003
Database last updated on 13.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip09.04.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GB
published on 26.05.2004  [2004/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MITSUI CHEMICALS, INC.
2-5, Kasumigaseki 3-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [1999/49]For all designated states
MITSUI CHEMICALS, INC.
2-5, Kasumigaseki 3-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Tomitaka, Tadashi
Mitsui Chemicals Inc., 1-2 Waki 6-chome, Waki-cho
Kuga-gun, Yamaguchi 740-0061 / JP
02 / Umeda, Michio
Mitsui Chemicals Inc., 1-2 Waki 6-chome, Waki-cho
Kuga-gun, Yamaguchi 740-0061 / JP
03 / Iwata, Hideaki
Mitsui Sekka Engineering Co., Ltd, 3 Chigusakaigan
Ichihara-shi, Chiba 299-0108 / JP
04 / Nakao, Fujimasa
Mitsui Sekka Engineering Co., Ltd, 6-1-2 Waki
Waki-cho, Kuga-gun, Yamaguchi 740-0061 / JP
[1999/49]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastrasse 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/49]HOFFMANN - EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date99109350.101.06.1999
[1999/49]
Priority number, dateJP1998015803905.06.1998         Original published format: JP 15803998
JP1998023771024.08.1998         Original published format: JP 23771098
[1999/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0962442
Date:08.12.1999
Language:EN
[1999/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0962442
Date:11.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.09.1999
ClassificationInternational:C07C51/265
[1999/49]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   GB [2000/33]
Former [1999/49]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung von aromatischen Carbonsäuren[1999/49]
English:Process for producing aromatic carboxylic acid[1999/49]
French:Procédé de préparation d'acides carboxyliques aromatiques[1999/49]
Examination procedure21.01.2000Examination requested  [2000/12]
15.12.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.04.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.12.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
15.02.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.05.2002Fee for grant paid
15.05.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.06.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
26.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipDE12.12.2002
GB01.06.2003
[2004/22]
Former [2003/46]DE12.12.2002
Documents cited:Search[A]WO9639595  (ICI PLC [GB], et al) [A] 1-11;
 [A]US4827025  (SHIRAKI SHIGEMI [JP], et al) [A] 1-11;
 [A]FR2303787  (INST FRANCAIS DU PETROLE [FR]) [A] 1-11;
 [A]JPH05213816
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19931207), vol. 017, no. 659, Database accession no. (C - 1137), [A] 1-11 * abstract *