EP1051916 - Tablets comprising millet and groundnut [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 25.07.2003 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2003 | Withdrawal of application | published on 10.09.2003 [2003/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Société des Produits Nestlé S.A. Case Postale 353 1800 Vevey / CH | [2000/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jegede, Oyelayo 76 Aspetuck village New Milford, CT 06776 / US | [2000/46] | Representative(s) | Micheli & Cie SA Rue de Genève 122 Case Postale 61 1226 Genève-Thônex / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2000/46] | Micheli & Cie Rue de Genève 122, Case Postale 61 1226 Genève-Thonex / CH | Application number, filing date | 99109563.9 | 14.05.1999 | [2000/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1051916 | Date: | 15.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/10, A23L1/36, A23P1/02 | [2000/46] | CPC: |
A23L25/30 (EP);
A23L7/10 (EP);
A23P10/28 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, FR, GB, LI [2001/31] |
Former [2000/46] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Tablette enthaltend Hirse und Erdnüsse | [2000/46] | English: | Tablets comprising millet and groundnut | [2000/46] | French: | Tablettes comprenant du millet et de l'arachide | [2000/46] | Examination procedure | 17.04.2001 | Examination requested [2001/24] | 16.05.2001 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 20.09.2001 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 11.07.2003 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2003/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 29.06.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 29.06.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.06.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 29.06.2001 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.06.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 29.06.2001 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 29.06.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 29.06.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 29.06.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.06.2001 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 29.06.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 29.06.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 29.06.2001 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 29.06.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 29.06.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2003 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2547167 (LOUCANOV IGNAT [FR]) [A] 1 * page 5, line 13 - line 17 * * examples IV,V,VIII-XIX *; | [A]OA09688 (MAMOUDOU MAMADOU SOW [SN]) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [A] - J. SOM, DISSERTATION ABSTRACTS INTERNATIONAL. B. THE SCIENCE AND ENGINEERING, ANN ARBOR, US, (1981), vol. 42, no. 02, ISSN 0419-4217, page 572-b, XP002119193 [A] 1 * the whole document * | [A] - I.NKAMA, FOOD AND NUTRITION BULETIN, (1995), vol. 16, no. 3, pages 238 - 240, XP002119194 [A] 1 * the whole document * | [A] - I.NKAMA, PLANT FOODS FOR HUMAN NUTRITION., (1994), vol. 46, pages 109 - 116, XP002119195 [A] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF01088762 |