Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0959302

EP0959302 - Fluegas exhaust duct silencer [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  11.05.2001
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.12.2009Change - representativepublished on 06.01.2010  [2010/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Reitz, Eberhard
Goldbergstrasse 13
35216 Biedenkopf / DE
[1999/47]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1999/47]
Representative(s)Wolf, Günter
An der Mainbrücke 16
63456 Hanau / DE
[N/P]
Former [2010/01]Wolf, Günter
An der Mainbrücke 16 Postfach 700245
63427 Hanau / DE
Former [1999/47]Wolf, Günter, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwalt Günter Wolf, An der Mainbrücke 16
63456 Hanau / DE
Application number, filing date99109672.817.05.1999
[1999/47]
Priority number, dateDE199812262420.05.1998         Original published format: DE 19822624
DE199812262620.05.1998         Original published format: DE 19822626
[1999/47]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0959302
Date:24.11.1999
Language:DE
[1999/47]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0959302
Date:23.02.2000
[2000/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.01.2000
ClassificationInternational:F23J13/00, F16L55/033
[1999/47]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2000/44]
Former [1999/47]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Rauchgasabzugsschalldämpfer[1999/47]
English:Fluegas exhaust duct silencer[1999/47]
French:Silencieux pour gaine de fumées d'échappement[1999/47]
Examination procedure24.08.2000Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2001/26]
19.12.2000Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2001/26]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
05.10.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
05.10.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
05.10.2000CH   M01   Not yet paid
05.10.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
05.10.2000DE   M01   Not yet paid
05.10.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
05.10.2000ES   M01   Not yet paid
05.10.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
05.10.2000FR   M01   Not yet paid
05.10.2000GB   M01   Not yet paid
05.10.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
05.10.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
05.10.2000IT   M01   Not yet paid
05.10.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
05.10.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
05.10.2000NL   M01   Not yet paid
05.10.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
05.10.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
05.10.2000M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[YA]DE29718443U  (REITZ EBERHARD [DE]) [Y] 1,2 * page 3, line 19 - page 4, line 2; figures 1,2 * [A] 9;
 [Y]CH411486  (COLCHESTER WOODS [GB]) [Y] 1,2 * page 1, line 52 - line 64; figure 1 *;
 [A]DE2907755  (TUNNER HERBERT) [A] 4 * page 6, line 18 - line 29; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]WO8912732  (DORCHESTER ENTERPRISES LTD [GB], et al) [A] 5 * page 4, line 3 - line 25; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]EP0822322  (IBIDEN CO LTD [JP]) [A] 10 * page 3, line 44 - line 54; figure 2 *;
 [A]DE3509033  (MUELLER BBM GMBH [DE]);
 [A]US3710891  (FLUGGER R);
 [A]DE2648505  (DISCOJET CORP);
 [A]WO9704220  (FERRI ALAIN [FR])
by applicantDE9005421U