blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0958889

EP0958889 - Apparatus and method for chamfering wafer [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.04.2007
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip27.04.2007No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 30.05.2007  [2007/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TOKYO SEIMITSU CO., LTD.
7-1, Shimorenjaku 9-chome Mitaka-shi
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [2006/25]For all designated states
TOKYO SEIMITSU CO., LTD.
7-1, Shimorenjaku 9-chome Mitaka-shi
Tokyo / JP
Former [1999/47]For all designated states
TOKYO SEIMITSU CO., LTD.
7-1, Shimorenjaku 9-chome
Mitaka-shi Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Katayama, Ichiro
7-1, Shimorenjaku 9-chome
Mitaka-shi, Tokyo / JP
02 / Iwaki, Masatami
7-1, Shimorenjaku 9-chome
Mitaka-shi, Tokyo / JP
03 / Ikeda, Kazumi
7-1, Shimorenjaku 9-chome
Mitaka-shi, Tokyo / JP
[1999/47]
Representative(s)Hering, Hartmut
Patentanwälte
Berendt, Leyh & Hering
Innere Wiener Strasse 20
81667 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/47]Hering, Hartmut, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwälte Berendt, Leyh & Hering Innere Wiener Strasse 20
81667 München / DE
Application number, filing date99109713.017.05.1999
[1999/47]
Priority number, dateJP1998013525718.05.1998         Original published format: JP 13525798
JP1998013525818.05.1998         Original published format: JP 13525898
JP1998030714828.10.1998         Original published format: JP 30714898
[1999/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0958889
Date:24.11.1999
Language:EN
[1999/47]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0958889
Date:16.01.2002
[2002/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0958889
Date:21.06.2006
Language:EN
[2006/25]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.12.2001
ClassificationIPC:B24B9/06, // H01L21/304
[1999/47]
CPC:
B24B9/065 (EP,US); B24B51/00 (EP,US); H01L21/02021 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE [2002/40]
Former [1999/47]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Abfasen einer Halbleiterplatte[1999/47]
English:Apparatus and method for chamfering wafer[1999/47]
French:Procédé et dispositif pour chanfreiner une plaquette semi-conductrice[1999/47]
Examination procedure19.04.2002Examination requested  [2002/26]
17.07.2002Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
17.01.2003Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
19.08.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.12.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.05.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.09.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.12.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.04.2006Fee for grant paid
13.04.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP05019809.2  / EP1618988
EP05019810.0  / EP1618989
Opposition(s)22.03.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/22]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
24.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
23.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
14.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
20.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
31.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
02.09.2002AT   M01   Not yet paid
02.09.2002BE   M01   Not yet paid
02.09.2002CH   M01   Not yet paid
02.09.2002CY   M01   Not yet paid
02.09.2002DK   M01   Not yet paid
02.09.2002ES   M01   Not yet paid
02.09.2002FI   M01   Not yet paid
02.09.2002FR   M01   Not yet paid
02.09.2002GB   M01   Not yet paid
02.09.2002GR   M01   Not yet paid
02.09.2002IE   M01   Not yet paid
02.09.2002IT   M01   Not yet paid
02.09.2002LU   M01   Not yet paid
02.09.2002MC   M01   Not yet paid
02.09.2002NL   M01   Not yet paid
02.09.2002PT   M01   Not yet paid
02.09.2002SE   M01   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]JPH04129656  ;
 [Y]DE8703250U  (BIELEFELDER UNION BRUNO KOCH GMBH) [Y] 4 * page 1, paragraph 1; figure 1 *;
 [Y]US5185965  (OZAKI HARUO [JP]) [Y] 3 * column 1, lines 5-21 *;
 [XY]US5609514  (YASUNAGA MASAAKI [JP], et al) [X] 1,6,14 * column 2, lines 8-28 * * column 2, lines 18-28 * [Y] 3,4;
 [X]US5658189  (KAGAMIDA TAKESHI [JP]) [X] 1,2,6,14,15,23 * column 1, lines 41-65 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920819), vol. 016, no. 391, Database accession no. (M - 1298), & JP04129656 A 19920430 (KAWASAKI STEEL CORP) [A] 2,5 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.