Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0962255

EP0962255 - Cyclone separator [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.12.2003
Database last updated on 18.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 21.01.2004  [2004/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KHD Humboldt-Wedag AG
Wiersbergstrasse
51103 Köln / DE
[1999/49]
Inventor(s)01 / Filges, Ralf
Kiebitzstrasse 3
51427 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
02 / Schilling, Horst
Roisdorfer Strasse 12
50959 Köln / DE
 [2003/04]
Former [1999/49]01 / Filges, Ralf
Kiebitzstrasse 3
51427 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
02 / Schilling, Horst
Roidorfer Strasse 12
50959 Köln / DE
Application number, filing date99110035.522.05.1999
[1999/49]
Priority number, dateDE199812520605.06.1998         Original published format: DE 19825206
[1999/49]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0962255
Date:08.12.1999
Language:DE
[1999/49]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0962255
Date:14.03.2001
[2001/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0962255
Date:29.01.2003
Language:DE
[2003/05]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.01.2001
ClassificationInternational:B04C5/13
[1999/49]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB [2001/49]
Former [1999/49]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Zyklonabscheider[1999/49]
English:Cyclone separator[1999/49]
French:Cyclone[1999/49]
Examination procedure05.09.2001Examination requested  [2001/44]
15.09.2001Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
24.01.2002Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) CH, CY, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
16.08.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.10.2002Fee for grant paid
31.10.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)30.10.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2004/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
21.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
23.10.2001CH   M01   Not yet paid
23.10.2001CY   M01   Not yet paid
23.10.2001FI   M01   Not yet paid
23.10.2001GR   M01   Not yet paid
23.10.2001IE   M01   Not yet paid
23.10.2001IT   M01   Not yet paid
23.10.2001LU   M01   Not yet paid
23.10.2001MC   M01   Not yet paid
23.10.2001NL   M01   Not yet paid
23.10.2001PT   M01   Not yet paid
23.10.2001SE   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[AD]DE3228902  (KLOECKNER HUMBOLDT DEUTZ AG [DE]) [AD] 1 * the whole document *