blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0974956 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0974956



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 102
15.01.2010 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
12.02.2009 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
15.01.2009 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
15.01.2009 French translation of claims Search / examination 1
15.01.2009 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
28.11.2008 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
21.10.2008 Request for issuance of patent certificate with patent specification Search / examination 1
07.10.2008 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
07.10.2008 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
07.10.2008 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
07.10.2008 Text intended for grant Search / examination 11
14.08.2008 Claims Search / examination 2
14.08.2008 Description Search / examination 2
14.08.2008 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
23.07.2008 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
23.07.2008 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
27.06.2008 General enquiry Search / examination 1
02.08.2006 Claims Search / examination 2
02.08.2006 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
10.07.2006 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
10.07.2006 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
28.06.2006 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
22.06.2006 General enquiry Search / examination 1
28.07.2005 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
22.07.2005 General enquiry Search / examination 1
11.03.2004 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
05.02.2004 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
14.01.2004 Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights Search / examination 1
14.01.2004 Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights Search / examination 1
11.12.2003 Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights Search / examination 4
11.12.2003 Request for transfer of rights Search / examination 1
18.06.2003 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
28.04.2003 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
28.04.2003 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
11.04.2003 General authorisation Search / examination 1
11.04.2003 Request for change of representative Search / examination 1
09.04.2003 Request for change of representative Search / examination 3
08.01.2002 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
13.11.2001 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
13.11.2001 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
13.11.2001 European search report Search / examination 1
15.12.1999 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
22.05.1999 Abstract Search / examination 1
22.05.1999 Claims Search / examination 2
22.05.1999 Description Search / examination 6
22.05.1999 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
22.05.1999 Drawings Search / examination 2
22.05.1999 Priority document Search / examination 14
22.05.1999 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6