blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0974956


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
25.06.2010 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.07.2010  [2010/30]
11.06.2010 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.07.2010  [2010/28]
15.01.2010 No opposition filed within time limit published on  17.02.2010  [2010/07]
06.02.2009 (Expected) grant published on  11.03.2009  [2009/11]
30.01.2009 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
30.01.2009 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
30.09.2008 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
19.08.2008 New entry: Reply to examination report
19.07.2008 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
08.04.2008 New entry: Renewal fee paid
31.05.2007 New entry: Renewal fee paid
08.08.2006 New entry: Reply to examination report
07.07.2006 First examination report
06.07.2006 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
05.04.2006 New entry: Renewal fee paid
03.06.2005 New entry: Renewal fee paid
04.06.2004 New entry: Renewal fee paid
06.02.2004 Change - applicant published on  24.03.2004  [2004/13]
17.05.2003 Renewal fee
25.04.2003 Change - representative published on  11.06.2003  [2003/24]
04.12.2002 Change - extension states
02.08.2002 Definitive list of designations published on  18.09.2002  [2002/38]
28.06.2002 Request for examination filed published on  14.08.2002  [2002/33]
31.05.2002 Renewal fee
16.11.2001 Publication of search report published on  02.01.2002  [2002/01]
16.11.2001 Change - classification published on  02.01.2002  [2002/01]
25.05.2001 Renewal fee
04.02.2000 Change - English title published on  22.03.2000 [2000/12]
11.12.1999 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  26.01.2000 [2000/04]