blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0974956
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP2000048508Global Dossier 18.02.2000A
Priority number Date
DE19833388 24.07.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP0974956Global Dossier 11.03.2009B1
EP0974956 02.01.2002A3
EP0974956 26.01.2000A2
Priority number Date
DE19833388 24.07.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE19833388 15.05.2003C2
DE19833388 27.01.2000A1
Priority number Date
DE19833388 24.07.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE69940532D 23.04.2009D1
Priority number Date
DE19833388 24.07.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
KR100392246B 22.07.2003B1
KR20000011305 25.02.2000A
Priority number Date
DE19833388 24.07.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
SG83138 18.09.2001A1
Priority number Date
DE19833388 24.07.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US6359755 19.03.2002B1
Priority number Date
DE19833388 24.07.1998