blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP0974956

Designated contracting states DELapse: 01.12.2009
 FRLapse: 02.06.2009
 GBLapse: 11.06.2009
Examination procedure16.01.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
15.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
06.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
24.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
24.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
28.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
22.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
27.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
European patent granted11.03.2009
Opposition procedure14.12.2009No opposition filed within time limit published on 10.02.2010 
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:26.01.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A2
Designated State(s):DE FR GB
 
Event date:26.01.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A2
Designated State(s):AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE
 
Event date:26.01.2000 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Free Format Text:AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI
 
Event date:22.03.2000 
Event description:TITLE (CORRECTION)
Free Format Text:PROCEDURE FOR THE SELECTIVE INFLUENCING OF OSCILLATION IN FINE OR MICROMECHANICAL CANTILEVER SYSTEMS
 
Event date:02.01.2002 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A3
Designated State(s):AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE
 
Event date:02.01.2002 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Free Format Text:AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI
 
Event date:02.01.2002 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
Free Format Text:7G 11B 5/58 A, 7G 11B 5/48 B, 7G 11B 5/55 B, 7G 11B 5/10 B
 
Event date:14.08.2002 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20020611
 
Event date:18.09.2002 
Event description:DESIGNATION FEES PAID
Free Format Text:DE FR GB
 
Event date:24.03.2004 
Event description:RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED
Owner Name:HITACHI GLOBAL STORAGE TECHNOLOGIES NETHERLANDS B.
 
Event date:09.08.2006 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20060710
 
Event date:11.03.2009 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):DE FR GB
 
Event date:11.03.2009 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED
 
Event date:23.04.2009 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:69940532
Country of Ref Document:DE
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:20090423
Kind Code of Ref Document:P
 
Event date:17.02.2010 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED
Effective DATE:20091214
 
Event date:24.02.2010 
Event description:GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE
Effective DATE:20090611
 
Event date:26.02.2010 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR ST
Code Expl.:-NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE
Effective DATE:20100129
 
Event date:30.04.2010 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20090602
 
Event date:31.05.2010 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20090611
 
Event date:30.06.2010 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20091201