Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0974956

EP0974956 - Procedure for the selective influencing of oscillation in fine or micromechanical cantilever systems [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/04]Procedure for the selective influencing of oscillation in fine or micromechanical cantileve systems
[2000/12]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.01.2010
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.06.2010Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): DE
published on 28.07.2010  [2010/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hitachi Global Storage Technologies Netherlands B.V.
Locatellikade 1
Parnassustoren
1076 AZ Amsterdam / NL
[N/P]
Former [2009/11]For all designated states
Hitachi Global Storage Technologies Netherlands B.V.
Locatellikade 1, Parnassustoren
1076 AZ Amsterdam / NL
Former [2004/13]For all designated states
Hitachi Global Storage Technologies Netherlands B.V.
Locatellikade 1, Parnassustoren
1076 AZ Amsterdam / NL
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
International Business Machines Corporation
Old Orchard Road
Armonk, NY 10504 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Dietzel, Andreas, Dr.
Auf der Benn 17a
55578 Wallertheim / DE
02 / Fleischmann, Friedrich, Dr.
Hinderburgstrasse 54
91054 Erlangen / DE
[2000/04]
Representative(s)Calderbank, Thomas Roger
Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2003/24]Calderbank, Thomas Roger
MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
Former [2000/04]Rach, Werner, Dr.
IBM Deutschland Informationssysteme GmbH, Patentwesen und Urheberrecht
70548 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date99110081.922.05.1999
[2000/04]
Priority number, dateDE199813338824.07.1998         Original published format: DE 19833388
[2000/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0974956
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/04]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0974956
Date:02.01.2002
[2002/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0974956
Date:11.03.2009
Language:EN
[2009/11]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.11.2001
ClassificationInternational:G11B5/58, G11B5/48, G11B5/55, G11B5/10
[2002/01]
Former International [2000/04]G11B5/58
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2002/38]
Former [2000/04]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur selektiven Beeinflussung von Schwingungen in feinen oder mikromechanischen Anordnungen[2000/04]
English:Procedure for the selective influencing of oscillation in fine or micromechanical cantilever systems[2000/12]
French:Procédure pour influencer d'une manière sélective les oscillations dans un système à-faux fin ou microméchanique[2000/04]
Former [2000/04]Procedure for the selective influencing of oscillation in fine or micromechanical cantileve systems
Examination procedure11.06.2002Examination requested  [2002/33]
10.07.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.08.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.07.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.08.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.10.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.01.2009Fee for grant paid
16.01.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)14.12.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2010/07]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
15.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
06.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
24.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
24.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
28.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
22.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
27.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR02.06.2009
GB11.06.2009
DE01.12.2009
[2010/30]
Former [2010/28]FR02.06.2009
GB11.06.2009
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0617407  (IBM [US]) [A] 1-11 * page 5, line 4 - column 46 *;
 [A]US4760478  (PAL GEORGE S [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * column 3, line 49 - column 6, line 6 *;
 [A]  LAMINATED SUSPENSION WITH HORIZONTAL HEAD/SLIDER IN A DATA RECORDING DISK FILE, ARMONK, NY, USA, IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, IBM CORP. NEW YORK, US, VOL. 38, NR. 6, PAGE(S) 341-343, ISSN 0018-8689, XP000520686 [A] 1 * page 341 - page 343 *