Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1037178

EP1037178 - Operational certificates for electronic commerce transactions [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  19.04.2002
Database last updated on 19.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.04.2002Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 05.06.2002  [2002/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
PHARMED DR. LIEDTKE GMBH
Tölzer Strasse 12
82031 Grünwald / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/38]For all designated states
pharmed Dr. Liedtke GmbH
Tölzer Strasse 12
82031 Grünwald / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Liedtke, Rainer K. Dr.
Postfach 1306
82027 Grünwald b. München / DE
[2000/38]
Representative(s)Pellmann, Hans-Bernd , et al
Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/38]Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date99110132.025.05.1999
[2000/38]
Priority number, dateDE199911191917.03.1999         Original published format: DE 19911919
[2000/38]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1037178
Date:20.09.2000
Language:DE
[2000/38]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1037178
Date:21.02.2001
[2001/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.01.2001
ClassificationInternational:G07F7/08, G07F19/00, G06K19/06, G07F7/10
[2001/08]
Former International [2000/38]G07F7/08, G07F19/00, G06K19/06
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/46]
Former [2000/38]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Operative Zertifikate zu Transaktionen im elektronischen Handel[2000/38]
English:Operational certificates for electronic commerce transactions[2000/38]
French:Certificats operationnels pour transactions de commerce électronique[2000/38]
Examination procedure22.08.2001Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/23]
21.12.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2002/23]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
02.10.2001M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.200103   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XA]DE19737232  (OBERLAENDER MATTHIAS [DE]) [X] 1,5,6 * the whole document * [A] 2-4;
 [XA]EP0623903  (PITNEY BOWES INC [US]) [X] 1,5 * abstract * [A] 2-4,6;
 [X]US5173594  (MCCLURE DANA W [US]) [X] 1 * abstract *;
 [XA]EP0829824  (PITNEY BOWES INC [US]) [X] 1 * abstract * [A] 2-6;
 [A]US5578808  (TAYLOR DOUGLAS C [US]) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5530232  (TAYLOR DOUGLAS C [US]) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *