Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0969487

EP0969487 - Toroidal current transformer assembly and method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.05.2005
Database last updated on 17.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip14.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 16.04.2008  [2008/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Siemens Energy & Automation, Inc.
333 Old Milton Parkway
Alpharetta, Georgia 30202 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
Siemens Energy & Automation, Inc.
3333 Old Milton Parkway
Alpharetta, Georgia 30202 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Titus, Solomon R.
10645 Bridgemor Drive
Alpharetta, GA 30202 / US
[2000/01]
Representative(s)McGowan, Nigel George , et al
Siemens AG
Postfach 22 16 34
80506 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2004/35]McGowan, Nigel George , et al
Siemens Shared Services, c/o Siemens AG, Postfach 22 16 34
80506 München / DE
Former [2000/01]Allen, Derek , et al
Siemens Group Services Limited, Intellectual Property Department, Siemens House, Oldbury
Bracknell, Berkshire RG12 8FZ / GB
Application number, filing date99110159.325.05.1999
[2000/01]
Priority number, dateUS1998010735030.06.1998         Original published format: US 107350
[2000/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0969487
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0969487
Date:14.07.2004
Language:EN
[2004/29]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.10.1999
ClassificationInternational:H01F38/30
[2000/01]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   SE [2000/37]
Former [2000/01]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Ringkernstromwandleranordnung und Verfahren[2000/01]
English:Toroidal current transformer assembly and method[2000/01]
French:Dispositif de transformateur de courant à noyau toroidal et procédé[2000/01]
Examination procedure26.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/34]
13.01.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.04.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.11.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.03.2004Fee for grant paid
08.03.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.04.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/27]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
14.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
13.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
13.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCH14.07.2004
FI14.07.2004
FR14.07.2004
IT14.07.2004
LI14.07.2004
SE14.10.2004
DE15.10.2004
ES25.10.2004
[2008/16]
Former [2006/32]CH14.07.2004
FI14.07.2004
FR14.07.2004
LI14.07.2004
SE14.10.2004
DE15.10.2004
ES25.10.2004
Former [2006/03]CH14.07.2004
FI14.07.2004
LI14.07.2004
SE14.10.2004
DE15.10.2004
ES25.10.2004
Former [2005/23]CH14.07.2004
FI14.07.2004
LI14.07.2004
SE14.10.2004
ES25.10.2004
Former [2005/21]CH14.07.2004
FI14.07.2004
LI14.07.2004
SE14.10.2004
Former [2005/11]FI14.07.2004
SE14.10.2004
Former [2005/10]SE14.10.2004
Documents cited:Search[X]GB782264  (HANS RITZ DR ING) [X] 1,12,19,23-25 * figures 1-17 *;
 [A]FR2396398  (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE [CH]);
 [A]US2929037  (BRETH JAMES C, et al);
 [A]US3160843  (THORPE HARRY A);
 [A]DE3521518  (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE [CH]);
 [A]US5583732  (SEYMOUR RAYMOND K [US], et al)