Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0969016

EP0969016 - Glucagon-like peptide and insulinotropin derivates [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  11.05.2001
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.05.2001Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 27.06.2001 [2001/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SCIOS INC.
2450 Bayshore Parkway
Mountain View, CA 94043 / US
[2000/01]
Inventor(s)01 / Andrews, Glenn C.
13 High Ridge Drive
Waterford, CT 06385 / US
02 / Daumy, Gaston O.
19 Clark Lane
Gales Ferry, CT 06335 / US
03 / Francoeur, Michael L.
1230 Southdown
Hillsborough, CA 94010 / US
04 / Larson, Eric R.
162 Lantern Hill Road
Mystic, CT 06355 / US
[2000/01]
Representative(s)White, Martin Paul , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
20 Red Lion Street
London
WC1R 4PJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]White, Martin Paul , et al
Kilburn & Strode, 20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Application number, filing date99110184.114.04.1993
[2000/01]
Priority number, dateUS1992089907315.06.1992         Original published format: US 899073
[2000/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0969016
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/01]
ClassificationInternational:C07K14/605, A61K38/26
[2000/01]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/01]
TitleGerman:Dem Glukagon ähnliche Peptide und Insulinotropin-Derivate[2000/01]
English:Glucagon-like peptide and insulinotropin derivates[2000/01]
French:Derivés d'insulinotropine et de peptide analogue au glucagon[2000/01]
Examination procedure22.06.1999Examination requested  [2000/01]
01.11.2000Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2001/26]
03.01.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2001/26]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP93909505.5  / EP0646128
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
22.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
22.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
22.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
22.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.200008   M06   Not yet paid