Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0977342

EP0977342 - Ac generator having claw-pole rotor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.12.2003
Database last updated on 22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.12.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 04.02.2004  [2004/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DENSO CORPORATION
1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city
Aichi-pref. 448-8661 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/05]For all designated states
Denso Corporation
1-1, Showa-cho
Kariya-city, Aichi-pref., 448-8661 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Nakamura, Shigenobu, c/o Denso Corporation
Intellectual Property Center, 1-1, Showa-cho
Kariya-city, Aichi-pref., 448-8661 / JP
02 / Shibata, Hiroshi, c/o Denso Corporation
Intellectual Property Center, 1-1, Showa-cho
Kariya-city, Aichi-pref., 448-8661 / JP
 [2003/06]
Former [2000/05]01 / Nakamura, Shigenubo, c/o Denso Corporation
Intellectual Property Center, 1-1, Showa-cho
Kariya-city, Aichi-pref., 448-8661 / JP
02 / Shibata, Hiroshi, c/o Denso Corporation
Intellectual Property Center, 1-1, Showa-cho
Kariya-city, Aichi-pref., 448-8661 / JP
Representative(s)Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB
Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A
85354 Freising / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/05]R.A. KUHNEN & P.A. WACKER
Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22
85354 Freising / DE
Application number, filing date99110310.227.05.1999
[2000/05]
Priority number, dateJP1998021447329.07.1998         Original published format: JP 21447398
[2000/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0977342
Date:02.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0977342
Date:12.02.2003
Language:EN
[2003/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:H02K19/22, H02K9/06
[2000/05]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/41]
Former [2000/05]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Wechselstromgenerator mit Klauenpolrotor[2000/05]
English:Ac generator having claw-pole rotor[2000/05]
French:Générateur à courant alternatif ayant un rotor à pôles à griffes[2000/05]
Examination proceduredeletedDecision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: No
19.01.2000Examination requested  [2000/12]
02.03.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.06.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.06.2001Request for accelerated examination filed
13.12.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.04.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.09.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.12.2002Fee for grant paid
06.12.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.11.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2004/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
14.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[A]US5343105  (SAKABE SHIGEKAZU [JP], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]JPH03226251  ;
 [A]JPS57122657  ;
 [A]US4263526  (TAGUCHI MASAHIRO, et al) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0198095  (NIPPON DENSO CO [JP]) [A] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19911227), vol. 015, no. 514, Database accession no. (E - 1150), [A] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19821102), vol. 006, no. 218, Database accession no. (E - 139), [A] 1 * abstract *