Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0964580

EP0964580 - Method and apparatus for production, transmission and display of television programs in commercial localities [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  18.04.2003
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.04.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 04.06.2003  [2003/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Breeze TV GmbH
Hauptstrasse 33
50259 Pulheim-Stommeln / DE
[1999/50]
Inventor(s)01 / Backhaus, Hagen, Prof. Dr.
Friedensstrasse 13
42349 Wuppertal / DE
[1999/50]
Representative(s)Bauer, Wulf
Patentanwälte
Bauer Vorberg Kayser
Partnerschaft mbB
Goltsteinstrasse 87
50968 Köln / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/50]Bauer, Wulf, Dr.
Bayenthalgürtel 15
50968 Köln (Marienburg) / DE
Application number, filing date99110328.428.05.1999
[1999/50]
Priority number, dateDE199812539410.06.1998         Original published format: DE 19825394
[1999/50]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0964580
Date:15.12.1999
Language:DE
[1999/50]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0964580
Date:12.07.2000
[2000/28]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.05.2000
ClassificationInternational:H04N7/18
[1999/50]
Designated contracting statesAT,   DE,   ES,   FR,   NL [2001/12]
Former [1999/50]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Herstellung, Übertragung und Wiedergabe von Fernsehprogrammen in Geschäftsräumen[1999/50]
English:Method and apparatus for production, transmission and display of television programs in commercial localities[1999/50]
French:Méthode et appareil de production, transmission et affichage de programmes de télévision pour locaux commerciaux[1999/50]
Examination procedure12.01.2001Examination requested  [2001/11]
03.12.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/23]
08.01.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2003/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.200204   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]DE9410248U  (PRODAC PROZESDATENTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,2,4,15,17 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5666291  (SCOTT ED [US], et al) [A] 1,2,17 * column 1, line 65 - column 2, line 35 * * column 2, line 63 - column 3, line 13 * * column 3, line 45 - line 23; figures 1,2 * * column 5, line 33 - column 6, line 33; figure 5 *;
 [A]DE9107565U  (CIS DIGITALE INFORMATIONSSYSTEME GMBH) [A] 1,17 * page 4, paragraph 1 - page 5, paragraph 3 * * page 5, paragraph 5 - page 7, paragraph 5; figure . *