Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0972679

EP0972679 - Process and device for helping a driver during backing [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.07.2007
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.08.2009Change - representativepublished on 30.09.2009  [2009/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
WABCO GmbH
Am Lindener Hafen 21
30453 Hannover / DE
[2007/02]
Former [2006/37]For all designated states
WABCO GmbH & Co. OHG
Am Lindener Hafen 21
30453 Hannover / DE
Former [2000/21]For all designated states
WABCO GmbH & Co. OHG
Am Lindener Hafen 21
30453 Hannover / DE
Former [2000/03]For all designated states
WABCO GmbH
Am Lindener Hafen 21
30453 Hannover / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Pietsch, Frank
Rebhuhnweg 12
30952 Ronnenberg / DE
02 / Neuhaus, Detlev
Am Uhrturm 20
30519 Hannover / DE
[2000/03]
Representative(s)Schrödter, Manfred , et al
WABCO GmbH Postfach 91 12 62
30432 Hannover / DE
[2009/40]
Former [2007/02]Schrödter, Manfred , et al
WABCO GmbH Postfach 91 12 80
30432 Hannover / DE
Former [2000/03]Schrödter, Manfred, Dipl.-Ing.
WABCO GmbH Postfach 91 12 62
30432 Hannover / DE
Application number, filing date99110434.029.05.1999
[2000/03]
Priority number, dateDE199813126211.07.1998         Original published format: DE 19831262
[2000/03]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0972679
Date:19.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/03]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0972679
Date:25.06.2003
[2003/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0972679
Date:13.09.2006
Language:DE
[2006/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.05.2003
ClassificationInternational:B60Q1/48, B60Q1/52
[2000/03]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [2004/12]
Former [2000/03]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Einrichtung zur Unterstützung des Fahrers eines Fahrzeuges bei Rückwärtsfahrt[2000/03]
English:Process and device for helping a driver during backing[2000/03]
French:Procédé et dispositif pour aider un conducteur en marche arrière[2000/03]
Examination procedure29.12.2003Examination requested  [2004/10]
18.11.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.01.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.03.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.08.2006Fee for grant paid
01.08.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)14.06.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
31.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
02.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
01.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
31.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
31.05.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[X]DE4201806  (SPRENGER PETER [CH]) [X] 1,9 * abstract *;
 [X]JPH0948263  ;
 [A]US3841427  (DI VITA V) [A] 1,9 * column A; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]US5748141  (HOESS ALFRED [DE]) [A] 1,9 * column A; figure 1 *;
 [A]DE4201970  (IRIS GMBH INFRARED & INTELLIGE [DE]) [A] 1,9 * abstract *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970630), vol. 097, no. 006, & JP09048263 A 19970218 (NISSAN MOTOR CO LTD) [X] 1,9 * abstract *
by applicantDE4404527