Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0976542

EP0976542 - Laminated glass and method for making a coated plastic sheet therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.09.2007
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 16.04.2008  [2008/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Oerlikon Trading AG, Trübbach
9477 Trübbach / CH
For all designated states
Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft
Petuelring 130
80809 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2006/45]For all designated states
Oerlikon Trading AG, Trübbach
9477 Trübbach / CH
For all designated states
Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft
80788 München / DE
Former [2006/44]For all designated states
Oerlikon Trading AG
9477 Trübbach / CH
For all designated states
Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft
80788 München / DE
Former [2001/11]For all designated states
Unaxis Trading AG
c/o Balzers AG
9477 Trübbach / CH
For all designated states
Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft
80788 München / DE
Former [2000/05]For all designated states
Balzers Hochvakuum AG
9477 Trübbach / CH
For all designated states
Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft
80788 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Sperger, Reinhard
Blasenberggasse 29b
6800 Feldkirch / AT
02 / Blueher, Peter
Wolfzornerstrasse 19
82041 Oberhaching / DE
03 / Zarfl, Hartmut
Spretistrasse 33
81927 München / DE
[2000/05]
Representative(s)Troesch Scheidegger Werner AG
Patentanwälte
Postfach
8032 Zürich / CH
[N/P]
Former [2000/05]Troesch Scheidegger Werner AG
Patentanwälte, Siewerdtstrasse 95, Postfach
8050 Zürich / CH
Application number, filing date99110548.701.06.1999
[2000/05]
Priority number, dateCH1998000132219.06.1998         Original published format: CH 132298
[2000/05]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0976542
Date:02.02.2000
Language:DE
[2000/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0976542
Date:27.09.2006
Language:DE
[2006/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:B32B17/10, C03C17/34, G02B5/28, C03C27/12
[2000/05]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/41]
Former [2000/05]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verbundglas und Verfahren zur Herstellung einer beschichteten Kunststoffolie vorzugsweise hierfür[2000/05]
English:Laminated glass and method for making a coated plastic sheet therefor[2000/05]
French:Verre laminé et procédé pour la fabrication d'une feuille en matière plastique revêtue pour le verre laminé[2000/05]
Examination procedure27.05.2000Examination requested  [2000/30]
03.08.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
13.11.2000Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
11.07.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.11.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.04.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.10.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.10.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.03.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.04.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.08.2006Fee for grant paid
15.08.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)28.06.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
04.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
11.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
06.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
06.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
11.04.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
04.09.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
04.09.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
04.09.2000CH   M01   Not yet paid
04.09.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
04.09.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
04.09.2000ES   M01   Not yet paid
04.09.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
04.09.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
04.09.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
04.09.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
04.09.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
04.09.2000NL   M01   Not yet paid
04.09.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
04.09.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT27.09.2006
[2008/16]
Documents cited:Search[A]DE3941796  (LEYBOLD AG [DE]) [A] 1,7-9,11,12,15-26 * page 3, line 2 - page 4, line 26; claim - * * page 4, line 62 - page 5, line 1 *;
 [A]FR1313190  (PITTSBURGH PLATE GLASS CO) [A] 1,7,8 * page 9, column L, paragraph 3 - paragraph 4 *;
 [A]US4581280  (TAGUCHI TAKASHI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9002653  (BOC GROUP INC [US]) [A] 17-22 * table - *;
 [A]DE4024308  (CENTRAL GLASS CO LTD [JP])
 [A]  GRANQVIST C G, "WINDOW COATINGS FOR THE FUTURE", THIN SOLID FILMS, (19901215), vol. 193 / 194, no. 1 / 02, pages 730 - 741, XP000168553 [A] 1

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0040-6090(90)90225-3