Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0969562

EP0969562 - Connecting system for the transmission of data and components for the system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  27.12.2002
Database last updated on 20.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip27.12.2002Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 05.02.2003  [2003/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1
DE-80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Dzyck, Wolfgang
Maasrangen 20a
96484 Meeder / DE
02 / Moeser, Harald
Hornstrasse 16
80797 München / DE
[2000/01]
Representative(s)(deleted)
...
[2003/05]
Former [2000/29]Viering, Jentschura & Partner
Postfach 22 14 43
80504 München / DE
Application number, filing date99110570.101.06.1999
[2000/01]
Priority number, dateDE199812948501.07.1998         Original published format: DE 19829485
[2000/01]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0969562
Date:05.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.10.1999
ClassificationInternational:H01R13/518
[2000/01]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   PT [2000/37]
Former [2000/01]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:System zum Bereitstellen einer elektrischen Verbindung zum Übertragen von Daten und Komponenten dieses Systems[2000/01]
English:Connecting system for the transmission of data and components for the system[2000/01]
French:Système de prise de connection pour le transfer de données et les composants de ce système[2000/01]
Examination procedure04.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/36]
14.03.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.06.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/06]
29.08.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2003/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
24.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[E]EP0859526  (ALSTHOM CGE ALCATEL [FR]) [E] 1,11,21,26 * column 6, line 24 - column 7, line 12; figures 1,2 *;
 [X]US5158480  (BLONDEEL GEERT [BE], et al) [X] 1 * column 2, line 44 - column 3, line 30; figures 1-3 *;
 [X]EP0727849  (WEATHERLEY RICHARD [GB]) [X] 1,21,26 * figure 3; claims 1-10 *;
 [XA]US5639267  (LOUDERMILK GREGORY [US]) [X] 1,2 * figure 7; claims 1-18 * [A] 3-30;
 [A]WO9744863  (WHITAKER CORP [US]) [A] 1-30 * the whole document *