blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0962490

EP0962490 - Modified emulsion of polycarbonate resin and process for production thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.07.2004
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip13.11.2009Change - representativepublished on 16.12.2009  [2009/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nisshinbo Industries, Inc.
31-11, Nihonbashi Ningyocho 2-chome Chuo-ku
Tokyo 103-8650 / JP
For all designated states
MATSUMOTO YUSHI-SEIYAKU CO., LTD.
1-3, Shibukawa-cho 2-chome Yao-shi
Osaka 581-0075 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1999/49]For all designated states
Nisshinbo Industries, Inc.
31-11, Nihonbashi Ningyocho 2-chome
Chuo-ku, Tokyo 103-8650 / JP
For all designated states
MATSUMOTO YUSHI-SEIYAKU CO., LTD.
1-3, Shibukawa-cho 2-chome
Yao-shi, Osaka 581-0075 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Imashiro, Yasuo, c/o Nisshinbo Industries Inc.
Tokyo Research Center 1-18-1 Nishiaraisakaecho
Adachi-ku, Tokyo 123-0843 / JP
02 / Takahashi, Ikuo, c/o Nisshinbo Industries Inc.
Tokyo Research Center 1-18-1 Nishiaraisakaecho
Adachi-ku, Tokyo 123-0843 / JP
03 / Masaki, Takao, Matsumoto Yushi-Seiyaku Co., Ltd.
1-3, Shibukawa-cho 2-chome
Yao-shi, Osaka 581-0075 / JP
04 / Iwao, Akito, Matsumoto Yushi-Seiyaku Co., Ltd.
1-3, Shibukawa-cho 2-chome
Yao-shi, Osaka 581-0075 / JP
[1999/49]
Representative(s)Zinnecker, Armin, et al
Lorenz Seidler Gossel
Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte
Partnerschaft mbB
Widenmayerstrasse 23
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/51]Zinnecker, Armin, et al
Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte - Patentanwälte Widenmayerstrasse 23
80538 München / DE
Former [1999/49]Zinnecker, Armin, Dipl.-Ing., et al
Lorenz-Seidler-Gossel, Widenmayerstrasse 23
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date99110597.401.06.1999
[1999/49]
Priority number, dateJP1998015441703.06.1998         Original published format: JP 15441798
[1999/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0962490
Date:08.12.1999
Language:EN
[1999/49]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0962490
Date:19.01.2000
[2000/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0962490
Date:03.09.2003
Language:EN
[2003/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.12.1999
ClassificationIPC:C08K5/29, C08L69/00, C09D169/00, C08J7/04
[2000/04]
CPC:
C08K5/29 (EP,US); C08L69/00 (EP,US)
C-Set:
C08K5/29, C08L69/00 (EP,US);
C08L69/00, C08L71/00 (US,EP)
Former IPC [1999/49]C08K5/29, C08L69/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/39]
Former [1999/49]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Modifizierte Polycarbonatharz-Emulsion und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung[1999/49]
English:Modified emulsion of polycarbonate resin and process for production thereof[1999/49]
French:Emulsion de résine de polycarbonate modifiée et procédé pour sa préparation[1999/49]
Examination procedure16.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/20]
02.08.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.12.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.01.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.04.2003Fee for grant paid
29.04.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)04.06.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
19.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
27.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]CA857947  ;
 [A]EP0598213  (BAYER AG [DE], et al);
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, Database accession no. 1970-92250R, XP002123966 & CA857947 A 00000000 (GENERAL ELECTRIC CO) [A] * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.