Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0962979

EP0962979 - Programmable electronic circuit with an identification number and external connections for control, actuation and display [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.01.2004
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.01.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 03.03.2004  [2004/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ancona, Lorenzo
Via Fiori Chiari, 12
20100 Milan / IT
For all designated states
Ancona, Cristiano
Via Faruffini 3
20100 Milan / IT
[1999/49]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1999/49]
Representative(s)Coloberti, Luigi
Luppi Intellectual Property Srl
Via De Amicis, 25
20123 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [1999/49]Coloberti, Luigi
Via E. de Amicis No. 25
20123 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date99110606.302.06.1999
[1999/49]
Priority number, dateIT1998MI0124403.06.1998         Original published format: IT MI981244
[1999/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0962979
Date:08.12.1999
Language:EN
[1999/49]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0962979
Date:03.05.2000
[2000/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0962979
Date:12.03.2003
Language:EN
[2003/11]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.03.2000
ClassificationInternational:H01L23/544
[1999/49]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [2001/02]
Former [1999/49]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Programmierbare elektronische Schaltung mit Identifikationsnummer und Aussenanschlüssen für Steuerung, Betätigung und Anzeigen[1999/49]
English:Programmable electronic circuit with an identification number and external connections for control, actuation and display[1999/49]
French:Circuit électronique programmable avec numéro d'identification et connexions extérieures à commande, à l'actionnement et à l'affichage[1999/49]
Examination procedure02.11.2000Examination requested  [2001/02]
04.11.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
12.02.2001Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) CY, DK, LU, MC, PT
24.10.2001Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.12.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.02.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.04.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
23.07.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.10.2002Fee for grant paid
11.10.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.12.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2004/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
11.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
01.12.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
01.12.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
01.12.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
01.12.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
01.12.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.200204   M06   Fee paid on   11.12.2002
Documents cited:Search[Y]US5686759  (HYDE JOHN W [US], et al) [Y] 1-14 * column 3, line 1 - column 4, line 17; figure 1 *;
 [Y]US4488148  (KUCIERA JOACHIM [US]) [Y] 1-14 * column 2, line 37 - column 4, line 7; figures 1,2 *;
 [Y]US5229649  (NIELSEN WYN Y [US], et al) [Y] 1-14 * column 10, line 65 - column 12, line 40; figure 2 *;
 [A]US5276692  (KWON SUN-DON [KR]) [A] 3 * column 1, lines 15-41; figure 1 *;
 [A]US5543761  (KLUGHART KEVIN M [US]) [A] 1 * column 1, lines 24-55 *