Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0969408

EP0969408 - Contact carrier [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.07.2003
Database last updated on 22.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.07.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 10.09.2003  [2003/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Amphenol-Tuchel Electronics GmbH
August-Häusser-Strasse 10
74080 Heilbronn / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
AMPHENOL-TUCHEL ELECTRONICS GmbH
August-Häusser-Strasse 10
D-74080 Heilbronn / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Schnell, Thomas
Am Teuerbrünnle 80/1
74078 Heilbronn / DE
02 / Braun, Gerhard
Alemannenstrasse 1
74626 Bretzfeld-Bitzfeld / DE
[2000/01]
Representative(s)Becker, Thomas , et al
Patentanwälte
Becker & Müller
Turmstrasse 22
40878 Ratingen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]Becker, Thomas, Dr., Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwälte Becker & Müller, Turmstrasse 22
40878 Ratingen / DE
Application number, filing date99110626.102.06.1999
[2000/01]
Priority number, dateDE199812955102.07.1998         Original published format: DE 19829551
[2000/01]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0969408
Date:05.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/01]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0969408
Date:08.11.2000
[2000/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0969408
Date:18.09.2002
Language:DE
[2002/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.09.2000
ClassificationInternational:H01R13/24, H01R12/16, G06K7/00, G06K19/077
[2002/16]
Former International [2000/45]G06K7/00, G06K19/077
Former International [2000/01]G06K19/077
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [2001/30]
Former [2000/01]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Kontaktträger[2000/01]
English:Contact carrier[2000/01]
French:Support de contact[2000/01]
Examination procedure12.10.2000Examination requested  [2000/49]
09.05.2001Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
05.09.2001Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, PT
13.03.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
15.04.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.06.2002Fee for grant paid
01.06.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.06.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
07.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
18.06.2001AT   M01   Not yet paid
18.06.2001CH   M01   Not yet paid
18.06.2001CY   M01   Not yet paid
18.06.2001DK   M01   Not yet paid
18.06.2001ES   M01   Not yet paid
18.06.2001FI   M01   Not yet paid
18.06.2001GR   M01   Not yet paid
18.06.2001IE   M01   Not yet paid
18.06.2001LU   M01   Not yet paid
18.06.2001MC   M01   Not yet paid
18.06.2001PT   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[DA]DE9407499U  (ITT COMPOSANTS INSTR [FR]) [DA] 1,2,6,10-12,14,15 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0827240  (AMPHENOL TUCHEL ELECT [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *