Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0972692

EP0972692 - Actuator for hydraulic device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.07.2004
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.07.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 18.08.2004  [2004/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft
Petuelring 130
80809 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/03]For all designated states
Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft
80788 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Brandl, Raimund
Baderallee 31a
94405 Landau/Isar / DE
02 / Peters, Hans-Günter
Schlachterstrasse 9
85283 Wolnzach / DE
[2000/03]
Application number, filing date99110653.502.06.1999
[2000/03]
Priority number, dateDE199813152714.07.1998         Original published format: DE 19831527
[2000/03]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0972692
Date:19.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0972692
Date:27.08.2003
Language:DE
[2003/35]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:B60T17/22, B60T11/30, B62L3/02
[2000/03]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/39]
Former [2000/03]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Hydraulische Betätigungseinrichtung[2000/03]
English:Actuator for hydraulic device[2000/03]
French:Dispositif d'actuation hydraulique[2000/03]
Examination procedure10.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/03]
22.01.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.05.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.06.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.09.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.10.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.11.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.12.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.04.2003Fee for grant paid
08.04.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)28.05.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
22.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
24.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0430835  (CILIENTO FELICE [FR]) [X] 1 * column 3, line 42 - column 4, line 53; figure 1 *;
 [A]US4785629  (ENNIS III JAMES F [US], et al) [A] 1 * column W *;
 [A]US4474272  (OMLIE DONALD E [US]) [A] 1 * column 1, line 56 - column 3, line 51; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]US4479511  (HOLLAND MARION D [US]) [A] 1 * column A; figures 1,3 *;
 [A]DE3935353  (TEVES GMBH ALFRED [DE]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 14 - column 5, line 161 *;
 [A]DE3216885  (MAGENWIRTH GMBH CO GUSTAV [DE]) [A] 1 * column A *