Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0970943

EP0970943 - Process for the preparation of the cyclopropylamine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  19.03.2004
Database last updated on 18.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.03.2004Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 06.05.2004  [2004/19]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Degussa GmbH
Bennigsenplatz 1
40474 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/18]For all designated states
Degussa AG
Bennigsenplatz 1
40474 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
Degussa-Hüls Aktiengesellschaft
60287 Frankfurt am Main / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Kaufhold, Manfred Dr.
Jasminweg 20
45770 Marl / DE
02 / Kleemiss, Wolfgang Dr.
Sixtusstrasse 56
45721 Haltern / DE
03 / Feld, Marcel Dr.
Im Lochgarten 56
51147 Köln / DE
[2000/02]
Application number, filing date99110655.002.06.1999
[2000/02]
Priority number, dateDE199813063309.07.1998         Original published format: DE 19830633
[2000/02]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0970943
Date:12.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/02]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0970943
Date:12.09.2001
[2001/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.08.2001
ClassificationInternational:C07C209/58, C07C67/00
[2001/37]
Former International [2000/02]C07C209/58
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI [2002/23]
Former [2000/02]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung von Cyclopropylamin[2000/02]
English:Process for the preparation of the cyclopropylamine[2000/02]
French:Procédé pour la préparation de la cyclopropylamine[2000/02]
Examination procedure08.03.2002Examination requested  [2002/20]
10.12.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.04.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.03.2004Application withdrawn by applicant  [2004/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
23.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
27.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[DYX]US3711549  (PHILLIPS L, et al) [DY] 1-6 * column 2, line 28 - column 3, line 10 * * column 3, line 10 - column 4, line 15 * * claim - * [X] 2-6;
 [DY]EP0205403  (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [DY] 1-6 * page 1, paragraph 4 - page 2, paragraph 2 * * page 3, line 28 - line 31 * * page 6, paragraph 1 - paragraph 4 * * page 17; example 3 *;
 [DA]EP0662470  (HUELS CHEMISCHE WERKE AG [DE]) [DA] 1-6 * page 2, column 1, line 1 - line 8 *;
 [DA]EP0365970  (BAYER AG [DE]) [DA] 1-6 * page 2, column 2, line 32 - column 3, line 18 *;
 [DA]DE19523868  (HUELS CHEMISCHE WERKE AG [DE]) [DA] 1-6 * abstract *;
 [A]US4520209  (SCHWARZE WERNER [DE], et al) [A] 1-6 * column 2, line 56 - column 4, line 3 *;
 [DA]EP0043949  (DEGUSSA [DE]) [DA] 1-6 * page 2, line 27 - page 3, line 8 *