Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0965896

EP0965896 - Numerical controller with a remote input device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.09.2005
Database last updated on 17.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip16.09.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 02.11.2005  [2005/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Dr. Johannes Heidenhain GmbH
Postfach 12 60
83292 Traunreut / DE
[1999/51]
Inventor(s)01 / Baumgartner, Alfons Dipl.Ing. (FH)
Mietenkamer Strasse 112
83224 Grassau / DE
[1999/51]
Application number, filing date99110688.102.06.1999
[1999/51]
Priority number, dateDE199812687517.06.1998         Original published format: DE 19826875
[1999/51]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0965896
Date:22.12.1999
Language:DE
[1999/51]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0965896
Date:05.01.2000
[2000/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0965896
Date:10.11.2004
Language:DE
[2004/46]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:G05B19/409
[1999/51]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI [2000/37]
Former [1999/51]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Numerische Steuerung mit einem räumlich getrennten Eingabegerät[1999/51]
English:Numerical controller with a remote input device[1999/51]
French:Commande numérique avec un dispositif d'entrée à distance[1999/51]
Examination procedure05.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/35]
27.02.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.06.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.11.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
13.12.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.05.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.07.2004Fee for grant paid
29.07.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)11.08.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
01.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
30.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
30.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0742500  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1,3-5,12-15,17,19-21 * column 9, line 46 - column 16, line 2; figures 1-4 *;
 [A]EP0742498  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-21 * column 4, line 5 - column 6, line 31; figure 1 *;
 [A]EP0742505  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-21 * column 1, line 57 - column 6, line 2; figure 1 *;
 [A]DE4312305  (ABB PATENT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-21 * column 2, line 31 - column 3, line 12; figure 1 *
ExaminationWO9515518