Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0962929

EP0962929 - Recording medium, recording apparatus and reproduction apparatus for selecting reproduction order of only specific digital data [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.07.2006
Database last updated on 19.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.10.2008Change - applicantpublished on 19.11.2008  [2008/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka
571-8501 / JP
[2008/47]
Former [2005/35]For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi
Osaka 571-8501 / JP
Former [1999/49]For all designated states
Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd.
1006, Oaza-Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Tagawa, Kenji
5-5-305, Myokenzaka
Katano-shi, Osaka / JP
02 / Minami, Masataka
2349-1, Kuruma, Higashiura-cho
Tsuna-gun, Hyogo-ken / JP
03 / Kozuka, Masayuki
19-1-1207, Ishizuminamimachi
Neyagawa-shi, Osaka / JP
[1999/49]
Representative(s)Kügele, Bernhard , et al
Novagraaf International SA
Chemin de l'Echo 3
1213 Onex / CH
[N/P]
Former [1999/49]Kügele, Bernhard , et al
NOVAPAT INTERNATIONAL SA, 9, Rue du Valais
1202 Genève / CH
Application number, filing date99110695.602.06.1999
[1999/49]
Priority number, dateJP1998015429603.06.1998         Original published format: JP 15429698
[1999/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0962929
Date:08.12.1999
Language:EN
[1999/49]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0962929
Date:12.01.2000
[2000/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0962929
Date:31.08.2005
Language:EN
[2005/35]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:G11B20/10
[1999/49]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/38]
Former [1999/49]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Aufzeichnungsmedium, Aufzeichnungsgerät und Wiedergabegerät zur Auswahl einer Wiedergabeordnung von nur spezifischen digitalen Daten[1999/49]
English:Recording medium, recording apparatus and reproduction apparatus for selecting reproduction order of only specific digital data[1999/49]
French:Support d'enregistrement, appareil d'enregistrement et appareil de reproduction pour sélectionner l'ordre de reproduction seulement de données numériques spécifiques[1999/49]
Examination procedure19.01.2000Examination requested  [2000/13]
15.01.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.05.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.06.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.10.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.12.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.03.2005Fee for grant paid
09.03.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP03012248.5  / EP1359581
Opposition(s)01.06.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
24.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
26.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
25.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
28.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0788094  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,4,8,10 * abstract * * column 1, line 18 - column 6, line 33 * * column 13, line 42 - column 14, line 37 * * column 22, line 54 - column 23, line 8 * * column 55, line 8 - line 38 * * figures 1,5 *;
 [X]EP0737980  (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [X] 1,4,8,10 * abstract * * column 2, line 10 - column 5, line 22 * * column 13, line 18 - line 34 * * column 13, line 53 - line 59 * * column 18, line 3 - line 20 * * column 23, line 17 - line 26 * * column 25, line 49 - line 58 * * column 35, line 8 - column 36, line 45 * * figures 1,5,17-19,44 *;
 [X]EP0689206  (SONY CORP [JP]) [X] 1,4,8,10 * abstract * * page 3, line 3 - page 4, line 6 * * page 4, line 39 - line 58 *;
 [XA]EP0724264  (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [X] 1 * abstract * * column 1, line 31 - column 5, line 31 * * column 12, line 10 - column 14, line 28 * * column 14, line 46 - line 51 * * column 16, line 18 - line 29 * * column 16, line 54 - column 17, line 2 * * column 18, line 59 - column 19, line 13 * * column 20, line 3 - line 17 * * column 22, line 31 - column 23, line 12 * * column 28, line 13 - line 25 * * figures 1,6,12,14,17,18 * [A] 4,8,10;
 [XA]US5642346  (TAIRA KAZUHIKO [JP], et al) [X] 1 * abstract * * column 1, line 13 - line 21 * * column 1, line 51 - line 65 * * column 3, line 43 - line 54 * * column 5, line 59 - column 6, line 18 * * column 8, line 9 - line 40 * * column 14, line 36 - line 52 * * figures 1,15-19,36 * [A] 4,8,10;
 [XA]WO9706531  (SONY CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1 * abstract * [A] 4,8,10;
 [XA]US5721724  (TAIRA KAZUHIKO [JP], et al) [X] 1 * the whole document * [A] 4,8,10;
 [XA]EP0685845  (TOSHIBA KK [JP], et al) [X] 1 * the whole document * [A] 4,8,10;
 [A]WO9638837  (VOQUETTE NETWORK LTD [IL], et al) [A] 2,3,5-7,9,11 * the whole document *