Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0969607

EP0969607 - Satellite-based measurement for uplink power control and time synchronization [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.08.2010
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.08.2010No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 08.09.2010  [2010/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hughes Electronics Corporation
200 N. Sepulveda Boulevard El Segundo
California 90245-0956 / US
[2009/40]
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
Hughes Electronics Corporation
200 N. Sepulveda Boulevard
El Segundo, California 90245-0956 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Strodtbeck, Andrew L.
123 East Oak Avenue 207
El Segundo, CA 90245 / US
02 / Vollbrecht, Jennifer L.
26107 Delos Drive
Torrance, CA 90505 / US
03 / Uyeda, Denise A.
810 Main Street 12
El Segundo, CA 90245 / US
[2000/01]
Representative(s)Lindner, Michael , et al
Witte, Weller & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
Postfach 10 54 62
70047 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/34]Lindner, Michael , et al
Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 10 54 62
70047 Stuttgart / DE
Former [2000/01]Lindner, Michael, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwälte, Witte, Weller & Partner, Rotebühlstrasse 121
70178 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date99110766.504.06.1999
[2000/01]
Priority number, dateUS1998010664929.06.1998         Original published format: US 106649
[2000/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0969607
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/01]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0969607
Date:18.09.2002
[2002/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0969607
Date:30.09.2009
Language:EN
[2009/40]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.08.2002
ClassificationInternational:H04B7/005, H04B7/185
[2000/01]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2003/23]
Former [2000/01]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Satellitemesssystem für Leistungsregelung in der Aufwärtsverbindung und Zeitsynchronisierung[2000/01]
English:Satellite-based measurement for uplink power control and time synchronization[2000/01]
French:Mesure sur un satellite pour le contrôle de la puissance dans la liaison montante et pour la synchronisation du temps[2000/01]
Examination procedure21.02.2003Examination requested  [2003/17]
31.03.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.11.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
22.01.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.11.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.04.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.01.2006Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
22.06.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.11.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.02.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.06.2009Fee for grant paid
15.06.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Appeal following examination17.02.2006Appeal received
26.05.2006Statement of grounds filed
25.08.2006Interlocutory revision of appeal
Opposition(s)01.07.2010No opposition filed within time limit [2010/36]
Request for further processing for:22.01.2004Request for further processing filed
22.01.2004Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
09.02.2004Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
21.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
19.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
19.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
19.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
19.05.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
22.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
21.05.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
16.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 11
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9826511  (GLOBALSTAR LP [US]) [X] 1,2,4-9 * page 4; figure 7; claim 1 *;
 [X]US4004224  (ARENS WALTER, et al) [X] 1,2,4-9 * abstract * * column 2, line 27 - column 3, line 51 *;
 [X]US5265119  (GILHOUSEN KLEIN S [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-9 * abstract * * column 7, line 30 - column 7, line 53 *;
 [X]US5333175  (ARIYAVISITAKUL SIRIKIAT [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-9 * abstract * * column 9, line 30 - column 10, line 22; figures 4,5 *;
 [A]US5768684  (GRUBB JERROLD LEE [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * column 2, line 44 - column 3, line 22 * * column 6, line 40 - column 7, line 15 *;
 [PX]EP0909042  (TRW INC [US]) [PX] 10,11,13-18 * abstract * * column 3, line 10 - line 31 * * column 11, line 1 - line 19 * * figures 2-4 *;
 [X]US4577316  (SCHIFF LEONARD N [US]) [X] 10,11,13,14,16-18 * abstract * * column 2, line 19 - line 35 * * column 3, line 1 - column 4, line 57 *;
 [X]EP0827293  (AT & T CORP [US]) [X] 10,11,13,14,16-18 * abstract * * column 1, line 45 - column 2, line 33 * * column 4, line 3 - line 17 * * column 6, line 36 - column 7, line 40 *;
 [X]EP0673130  (NEC CORP [JP]) [X] 10,11,13,14,16-18 * abstract * * column 3, line 30 - column 4, line 7 *;
 [A]  MARAL BOUSQUET, Satellite Communications Systems, SATELLITE COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEMS. SYSTEMS, TECHNIQUES AND TECHNOLOGY, WILEY SERIES IN COMMUNICATION AND DISTRIBUTED SYSTEMS, CHICHESTER, JOHN WILEY & SONS, GB, PAGE(S) 140-164, ISBN 0-471-93032-6, XP002196110 [A] 10-19 * page 145 - page 150 *