Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0988899

EP0988899 - Washing device for cleaning machines [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.10.2005
Database last updated on 15.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.07.2006Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GB
published on 30.08.2006  [2006/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
R.E.A. s.n.c. di Sassi e Baudin & C.
Via R. Lombardi 6
10028 Trofarello (Torino) / IT
[2000/13]
Inventor(s)01 / Sassi, Stefano
Via Galileo Galilei 16
10024 Moncalieri (TO) / IT
[2000/13]
Representative(s)Robba, Pierpaolo , et al
Interpatent S.R.L.
Via Caboto, 35
10129 Torino / IT
[N/P]
Former [2000/13]Robba, Pierpaolo , et al
Interpatent, Via Caboto 35
10129 Torino / IT
Application number, filing date99110815.005.06.1999
[2000/13]
Priority number, dateIT1998TO0081125.09.1998         Original published format: IT TO980811
[2000/13]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0988899
Date:29.03.2000
Language:EN
[2000/13]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0988899
Date:13.11.2002
[2002/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0988899
Date:08.12.2004
Language:EN
[2004/50]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.10.2002
ClassificationInternational:B08B3/00
[2000/13]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   LI [2003/31]
Former [2000/13]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Waschvorrichtung für Reinigungsmaschinen[2000/13]
English:Washing device for cleaning machines[2000/13]
French:Dispositif de lavage pour machines de nettoyage[2000/13]
Examination procedure11.04.2003Examination requested  [2003/24]
21.06.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.09.2004Fee for grant paid
17.09.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)09.09.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
19.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
04.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
30.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR08.12.2004
DE09.03.2005
ES19.03.2005
GB05.06.2005
CH30.06.2005
LI30.06.2005
[2006/35]
Former [2006/33]FR08.12.2004
DE09.03.2005
ES19.03.2005
CH30.06.2005
LI30.06.2005
Former [2006/32]FR08.12.2004
DE09.03.2005
ES19.03.2005
Former [2006/13]DE09.03.2005
ES19.03.2005
Former [2006/12]ES19.03.2005
Documents cited:Search[DA]ITTO940959  (R E A S N C DI SASSI E BAUDIN [IT]) [DA] 1,2,5,6 * abstract * * page 6, line 11 - page 12, column 1; figure - *;
 [A]GB1209491  (LANCY LAB LTD) [A] 1,6 * page 1, line 80 - page 2, line 2 * * page 3, line 3 - line 82; figure - *