blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0976424

EP0976424 - Pyrotechnical, aerosol-forming composition for extinguishing fires and process for its preparation [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.03.2004
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip16.04.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 02.06.2004  [2004/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
R-Amtech International, Inc.
2101 - 112th Avenue, NE, Suite 210 Bellevue
Washington 98004 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/05]For all designated states
R-Amtech International, Inc.
2101 - 112th Avenue, NE, Suite 210
Bellevue, Washington 98004 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Drakin, Nikolaj Vasil'evic
Skol'nyj bul'var, d. 7, kv. 13 p. Chernogolovka
Noginskij rajon, 142432 Moskovskaja Obla / RU
[2000/05]
Representative(s)von Füner, Nicolai, et al
v. Füner Ebbinghaus Finck Hano Patentanwälte Postfach 95 01 60
81517 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/29]von Füner, Nicolai, Dr., et al
v. Füner Ebbinghaus Finck Hano Patentanwälte Postfach 95 01 60
81517 München / DE
Former [2000/05]von Füner, Alexander, Prof.h.c. Dr., et al
v. Füner Ebbinghaus Finck Hano Mariahilfplatz 2 & 3
81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date99110884.607.06.1999
[2000/05]
Priority number, dateRU1998011395230.07.1998         Original published format: RU 98113952
[2000/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0976424
Date:02.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0976424
Date:02.05.2003
Language:EN
[2003/18]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.10.1999
ClassificationIPC:A62D1/06
[2000/05]
CPC:
A62C99/0018 (EP,US); A61D1/06 (EP,US); A62C5/006 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2000/41]
Former [2000/05]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Aerosolbildende Zusammensetzung zum Löschen von Bränden und Verfahren zur Herstellung dieser Zusammensetzung[2000/05]
English:Pyrotechnical, aerosol-forming composition for extinguishing fires and process for its preparation[2000/05]
French:Composition génératrice de gaz pour extinction des feux et procédé pour la préparer[2000/05]
Examination procedure04.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/35]
20.07.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.11.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.10.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.01.2003Fee for grant paid
02.01.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.02.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
25.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipDE05.08.2003
[2004/23]
Documents cited:Search[A]RU1764213  ;
 [A]RU1821985  ;
 [A]RU2060743  ;
 [A]DE19717044  (ZAKRYTOE AKCIONERNOE OBSCESTVO [RU]) [A] 1-7 * example -; claim - *;
 [DA]EP0804946  (AMTECH R INT INC [US]) [DA] 1-7;
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 95, no. 29, Database accession no. 95-223088, XP002033750 & SU1764213 A 19950110 (FIRE FIGHTING RES INST) [A] 1-4 * abstract *
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 95, no. 41, Database accession no. 95-319363, XP002033751 & SU1821985 A 19950320 (FIRE FIGHTING RES INST) [A] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 97, no. 08, Database accession no. 97-085439, XP002033752 & RU2060743 C 19960527 (INTERTEKHNOLOG RES PRODN ENTERP) [A] 1 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.