EP0965552 - Yarn reserve monitoring device in weft feeders for weaving looms [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.06.2004 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.06.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.07.2004 [2004/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L.G.L. Electronics S.p.A. Via Ugo Foscolo, 156 24024 Gandino (Bergamo) / IT | [1999/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pedrini, Giovanni Via Mosconi 29 24026 Leffe / IT | [1999/51] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Guido, et al Spandonari & Modiano S.r.l., Corso Duca degli Abruzzi, 16 10129 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1999/51] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Spandonari & Modiano S.r.l., Corso Duca degli Abruzzi, 16 10129 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 99110975.2 | 09.06.1999 | [1999/51] | Priority number, date | IT1998TO00520 | 16.06.1998 Original published format: IT TO980520 | [1999/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0965552 | Date: | 22.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0965552 | Date: | 05.07.2000 | [2000/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0965552 | Date: | 30.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.05.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B65H51/22, D03D47/34 | [1999/51] | CPC: |
D03D47/367 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, LI, SE [2001/11] |
Former [1999/51] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Überwachung der Fadenreserve in Schussfadenliefervorrichtungen für Webmaschinen | [1999/51] | English: | Yarn reserve monitoring device in weft feeders for weaving looms | [1999/51] | French: | Dispositif pour surveiller la réserve de fil dans les fournisseurs de trame de métiers à tisser | [1999/51] | Examination procedure | 21.12.2000 | Examination requested [2001/08] | 02.12.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.04.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 01.04.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.05.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4325520 (HINTSCH OTTO) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [A]US3844504 (LAWSON JOHN B [US]) [A] 1 * figure 3 *; | [A]DE19611998 (IRO AB [SE]) [A] 1 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]DE19622254 (IRO AB [SE]); | [A]FR2439249 (LEESONA CORP [US]); | [A]FR2239882 (DREVILLE OLIVIER [FR]) |