Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0964016

EP0964016 - Aromatic-aliphatic copolycarbonate and process for producing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  17.06.2005
Database last updated on 18.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip17.06.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 03.08.2005  [2005/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL COMPANY, INC.
No. 5-2, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [1999/50]For all designated states
MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL COMPANY, INC.
No. 5-2, Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Nagai, Satoshi, Mitsubishi Gas Chem. Company, Inc.
Corporate Research Laboratory, 22, Wadai
Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki / JP
02 / Kondo, Osamu, Mitsubishi Gas Chem. Company, Inc.
Corporate Research Laboratory, 22, Wadai
Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki / JP
03 / Takakuwa, Kyohei, Mitsubishi Gas Chem. Comp., Inc.
Corporate Research Laboratory, 22, Wadai
Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki / JP
04 / Isahaya, Yoshinori, Mitsubishi Gas Chem. Comp., Inc
Corporate Research Laboratory, 22, Wadai
Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki / JP
05 / Fujimori, Takayasu, Mitsubishi Gas Chem. Comp., Inc
Corporate Research Laboratory, 22, Wadai
Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki / JP
[1999/50]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastrasse 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/50]HOFFMANN - EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date99110992.710.06.1999
[1999/50]
Priority number, dateJP1998016217610.06.1998         Original published format: JP 16217698
JP1998016520312.06.1998         Original published format: JP 16520398
[1999/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0964016
Date:15.12.1999
Language:EN
[1999/50]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0964016
Date:06.11.2002
[2002/45]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.09.2002
ClassificationInternational:C08G64/20, C08G64/16
[1999/50]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2003/30]
Former [1999/50]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Aliphatisch-aromatischen Copolycarbonaten und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung[1999/50]
English:Aromatic-aliphatic copolycarbonate and process for producing the same[1999/50]
French:Polycarbonates aromatiques-aliphatiques et leur procédé de préparation[1999/50]
Examination procedure24.03.2003Examination requested  [2003/21]
20.02.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.06.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.07.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.02.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/31]
04.03.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2005/31]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
26.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
23.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
25.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[YD]US4910283  (KAWAKI TAKAO [JP], et al) [YD] 1-8 * column 1, line 5 - line 15; claims 1,2; table 1 * * column 1, line 35 - line 38 *;
 [Y]US5021542  (SERINI VOLKER [DE], et al) [Y] 1-8 * column 1, line 43 - line 55; examples 1,3; claims 1,2 *