02.07.2010 |
Revocation of patent |
published on 04.08.2010 [2010/31] |
30.06.2010 |
New entry: Despatch of communication that patent is revoked |
|
23.03.2010 |
New entry: Decision (+date) in appeal procedure |
|
23.03.2010 |
New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
18.12.2009 |
Change: Date of oral proceedings |
|
18.12.2009 |
Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
30.05.2008 |
Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative |
published on 02.07.2008 [2008/27] |
18.04.2008 |
New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal |
|
08.03.2008 |
Change: Appeal number |
|
07.03.2008 |
New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal |
|
18.12.2007 |
New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
18.12.2007 |
New entry: Despatch of communication that opposition is rejected |
|
15.06.2007 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
02.08.2006 |
New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition |
|
13.06.2006 |
New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit |
|
19.05.2006 |
Opposition filed |
published on 21.06.2006 [2006/25] |
24.06.2005 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 10.08.2005 [2005/32] |
24.06.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.06.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.04.2004 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
20.02.2004 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
20.02.2004 |
First examination report |
|
22.10.2003 |
Deletion: Fee payment for extension state |
|
22.10.2003 |
Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state |
|
06.08.2003 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
26.06.2003 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
20.06.2003 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 06.08.2003 [2003/32] |
07.06.2003 |
Renewal fee |
|
12.03.2003 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
15.11.2002 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 02.01.2003 [2003/01] |
04.10.2002 |
Publication of search report |
published on 20.11.2002 [2002/47] |
05.06.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
29.05.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
03.12.1999 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 19.01.2000 [2000/03] |