Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0972700

EP0972700 - Front bearing for tilt cab truck [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  02.07.2010
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.07.2010Revocation of patentpublished on 04.08.2010  [2010/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MAN Nutzfahrzeuge Aktiengesellschaft
Postfach 50 06 20
80976 München / DE
[2000/03]
Inventor(s)01 / Kienast, Frank, Dipl.-Ing.
Scheyerstrasse 72a
85726 Pfaffenhofen/Ilm / DE
02 / Wunderlich, Walter, Dipl.-Ing.
Penz 23a
4441 Behamberg / AT
03 / Riebeck, Lars, Dipl.-Ing.
Hermann-Stockmann-Strasse 85
85221 Dachau / DE
04 / Breitling, Ulrich, Dr.-Ing.
Oselstrasse 20
81245 München / DE
05 / Rieck, Gerhard, Dipl.-Ing.
Fasanenstrasse 30
81247 München / DE
[2000/03]
Application number, filing date99111008.110.06.1999
[2000/03]
Priority number, dateDE199813132913.07.1998         Original published format: DE 19831329
[2000/03]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0972700
Date:19.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/03]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0972700
Date:20.11.2002
[2002/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0972700
Date:10.08.2005
Language:DE
[2005/32]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.10.2002
ClassificationInternational:B62D33/067
[2000/03]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   IT,   NL,   SE [2003/32]
Former [2000/03]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Vordere Lagerung des kippbaren Fahrerhauses eines Lastkraftwagens[2000/03]
English:Front bearing for tilt cab truck[2000/03]
French:Palier avant pour la cabine basculante d'un camion[2000/03]
Examination procedure30.10.2002Examination requested  [2003/01]
19.03.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.06.2003Fee for grant paid
26.07.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
24.02.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
20.04.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  09.05.2006  22.05.2006  ADMISSIBLE
Daimler AG
70546 Stuttgart / DE
 [2008/27]
Former [2006/25]
Opponent(s)01  09.05.2006   
DaimlerChrysler AG IPM/B, HPC, C106
70546 Stuttgart / DE
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
16.06.2006Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
27.07.2006Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
12.10.2007Date of oral proceedings
20.12.2007Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
20.12.2007Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
18.03.2010Legal effect of revocation of patent [2010/31]
18.03.2010Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition14.02.2008Appeal received No.  T0481/08
17.04.2008Statement of grounds filed
18.03.2010Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent
18.03.2010Date of oral proceedings
25.03.2010Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
23.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
27.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
01.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
13.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[DXY]DE19612502  (MAN NUTZFAHRZEUGE AG [DE]) [DX] 1 * column 3, line 29 - line 38; figures 4A,-,4C * [Y] 2;
 [Y]DE19637920  (SCANIA CV AB [SE]) [Y] 2 * column 2, line 42 - column 3, line 12; figures 1-6 *;
 [PA]JPH10316013  ;
 [A]US4061392  (LOWDER JAMES E, et al) [A] 1 * column 5, line 35 - column 6; figure -; claim 10 *;
 [A]EP0621170  (STEYR NUTZFAHRZEUGE [AT]) [A] 3 * abstract *
 [PA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990331), vol. 1999, no. 03, [PA] 3 * abstract *
by applicantDE19612502
 DE4413414