Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1054079

EP1054079 - Method and apparatus for high-speed strip treatment [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.03.2005
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip10.02.2006Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): NL
published on 29.03.2006  [2006/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Danieli Technology, Inc.
800 Cranberry Woods Drive - Suite 400
Cranberry Township, PA 16066 / US
[2001/34]
Former [2000/47]For all designated states
Danieli Corporation
3805 Henricks Road, P.O. Box 180
Youngstown, Ohio 44501 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Lordo, Richard Kenneth
1960, South Keel Ridge Road
Hermitage, PA 16148 / US
02 / Persson, Thomas Sven
2325, Selma Avenue
Youngstown, OH 44504 / US
[2000/47]
Representative(s)Petraz, Gilberto Luigi , et al
GLP S.r.l.
Viale Europa Unita, 171
33100 Udine / IT
[N/P]
Former [2000/47]Petraz, Gilberto Luigi , et al
GLP S.r.l. Piazzale Cavedalis 6/2
33100 Udine / IT
Application number, filing date99111136.008.06.1999
[2000/47]
Priority number, dateUS1999031566720.05.1999         Original published format: US 315667
[2000/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1054079
Date:22.11.2000
Language:EN
[2000/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1054079
Date:06.05.2004
Language:EN
[2004/19]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:C23G3/02
[2000/47]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [2001/32]
Former [2000/47]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
Extension statesSI08.05.2001
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Hochgeschwindigkeitsbehandlung eines Bandes[2000/47]
English:Method and apparatus for high-speed strip treatment[2000/47]
French:Procédé et appareil pour le traitement à grande vitesse de bandes[2000/47]
Examination procedure08.05.2001Examination requested  [2001/27]
04.03.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.07.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.10.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.02.2004Fee for grant paid
20.02.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)08.02.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
26.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
24.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE06.05.2004
CH06.05.2004
FI06.05.2004
LI06.05.2004
NL06.05.2004
GB06.08.2004
GR06.08.2004
SE06.08.2004
[2006/13]
Former [2005/46]BE06.05.2004
CH06.05.2004
FI06.05.2004
LI06.05.2004
GB06.08.2004
GR06.08.2004
SE06.08.2004
Former [2005/14]BE06.05.2004
CH06.05.2004
FI06.05.2004
LI06.05.2004
GR06.08.2004
SE06.08.2004
Former [2005/06]CH06.05.2004
FI06.05.2004
LI06.05.2004
GR06.08.2004
SE06.08.2004
Former [2005/02]CH06.05.2004
FI06.05.2004
LI06.05.2004
SE06.08.2004
Former [2004/52]CH06.05.2004
LI06.05.2004
SE06.08.2004
Former [2004/51]CH06.05.2004
LI06.05.2004
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0795629  (ANDRITZ PATENTVERWALTUNG [AT]) [X] 1,2,12 * figure 4; claims 1,3 *;
 [DA]US5803981  (LORDO RICHARD [US]) [DA] 1,2,12 * figure 2; claim 1 *;
 [DA]US5116447  (KIMURA TOMOAKI [JP], et al) [DA] 1,12 * figure 2; claim 9 *;
 [DA]US5716455  (ZEDNICEK MICHAEL [AT], et al)