Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0965609 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0965609



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 74
17.02.2014 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
26.01.2004 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
06.02.2003 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
23.01.2003 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
12.12.2002 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
12.12.2002 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
12.12.2002 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
01.10.2002 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 3
23.09.2002 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
31.05.2002 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
31.05.2002 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
31.05.2002 Text intended for grant Search / examination 9
03.05.2002 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
05.04.2002 General enquiry Search / examination 1
18.10.2000 Designation deemed to be withdrawn (non payment of designation fees) Search / examination 1
10.08.2000 Communication concerning non paid of designation fees Search / examination 1
03.04.2000 Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states Search / examination 1
25.01.2000 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
08.12.1999 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 2
08.12.1999 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
08.12.1999 European search report Search / examination 1
10.11.1999 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
08.07.1999 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
08.07.1999 Priority document Search / examination 16
08.06.1999 Abstract Search / examination 1
08.06.1999 Claims Search / examination 2
08.06.1999 Description Search / examination 7
08.06.1999 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
08.06.1999 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 7