Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0965609


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
24.01.2004 No opposition filed within time limit published on  10.03.2004  [2004/11]
31.01.2003 (Expected) grant published on  19.03.2003  [2003/12]
23.12.2002 Communication of intention to grant a patent
27.09.2002 Communication of intention to grant
27.09.2002 Communication of intention to grant a patent
10.07.2002 Renewal fee
24.05.2002 First examination report
22.05.2002 Communication of intention to grant
03.05.2002 Change - German title published on  19.06.2002  [2002/25]
14.03.2002 Communication of intention to grant
11.07.2001 Renewal fee
25.01.2001 Loss of particular rights
13.10.2000 Loss of particular rights
09.10.2000 Change - extension states
11.08.2000 Definitive list of designations published on  27.09.2000 [2000/39]
07.08.2000 Period of grace (R.85a/R.108(3) EPC1973)
14.04.2000 Request for examination filed published on  31.05.2000 [2000/22]
11.12.1999 Change - classification published on  26.01.2000 [2000/04]
03.12.1999 Publication of search report published on  19.01.2000 [2000/03]
05.11.1999 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  22.12.1999 [1999/51]