Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0965609

EP0965609 - Biodegradable expanded starch products and the method of preparation [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.01.2004
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip24.01.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 10.03.2004  [2004/11]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
National Starch and Chemical Investment Holding Corporation
P.O. Box 7663 Wilmington
Delaware 19803-7663 / US
[N/P]
Former [1999/51]For all designated states
National Starch and Chemical Investment Holding Corporation
P.O. Box 7663
Wilmington, Delaware 19803-7663 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Roesser, David S.
517 County Road 519
Frenchtown, NJ 08825 / US
02 / Nevling, John
17 Hillcrest Avenue
Gladstone, NJ 07934 / US
03 / Rawlins, David C.
416 Patton Avenue
Piscataway, NJ 08854 / US
04 / Billmers, Robert L.
406 Rosemont Ringoes Road
Stockton, NJ 08559 / US
[1999/51]
Representative(s)Held, Stephan , et al
Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte
Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Postfach 86 06 24
81633 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/51]Held, Stephan, Dr.rer.nat., Dipl.-Chem. , et al
Patentanwälte, Hagemann, Braun und Held, Patentanwälte, Postfach 86 03 29
81630 München / DE
Application number, filing date99111139.408.06.1999
[1999/51]
Priority number, dateUS1998009785916.06.1998         Original published format: US 97859
[1999/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0965609
Date:22.12.1999
Language:EN
[1999/51]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0965609
Date:19.01.2000
[2000/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0965609
Date:19.03.2003
Language:EN
[2003/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:C08J9/12, C08J9/00, C08L3/08, // C08L3/00, C08L29/04
[2000/04]
Former International [1999/51]C08J9/12, // C08L3/00, C08L29/04
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IE,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/39]
Former [1999/51]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Biologisch abbaubare expandierte Stärkeprodukte und Verfahren zu deren Herstellung[2002/25]
English:Biodegradable expanded starch products and the method of preparation[1999/51]
French:Produits amylaces biodégradables expansés et leur procédé de fabrication[2002/25]
Former [1999/51]Biologisch abbaubare Stärkeprodukte und Verfahren zu deren Herstellung
Former [1999/51]Produits amylaces biodégradables et leur procédé de fabrication
Examination procedure03.04.2000Examination requested  [2000/22]
20.07.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
18.10.2000Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) CY, GR, IT, MC
31.05.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
01.10.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.12.2002Fee for grant paid
12.12.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)22.12.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2004/11]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
28.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
10.08.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
10.08.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
10.08.2000IT   M01   Not yet paid
10.08.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9216583  (PARKE DAVIS & CO) [X] 1-10 * page 1, line 15 - line 17 * * claims 1-3,12,13,20-22,27,29-33,62,77,78,81,92-95 *;
 [DA]EP0376201  (NAT STARCH CHEM CORP) [DA] 1-10 * claims 1,3,4,7,10,15,34-40 *;
 [A]WO9218325  (ENVIROPACK INC) [A] 1-10 * page 4, paragraph L - page 5, line 3 * * page 7, paragraph 1 - page 7, paragraph 2 *