Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0972974

EP0972974 - Mechanical seal for turbomachine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  04.06.2004
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip04.06.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 21.07.2004  [2004/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Alstom
25, Avenue Kléber
75116 Paris / FR
[2002/27]
Former [2000/03]For all designated states
ABB PATENT GmbH
Kallstadter Strasse 1
68309 Mannheim / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Urlichs, Karl, Dr.-Ing.
Klausener Winkel 18
90482 Nürnberg / DE
[2000/03]
Representative(s)DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Friedrichstraße 6
70174 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/09]Dreiss, Fuhlendorf, Steimle & Becker
Gerokstrasse 6
70188 Stuttgart / DE
Former [2000/03]Miller, Toivo , et al
ABB Patent GmbH Postfach 10 03 51
68128 Mannheim / DE
Application number, filing date99111179.009.06.1999
[2000/03]
Priority number, dateDE199813198816.07.1998         Original published format: DE 19831988
[2000/03]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0972974
Date:19.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/03]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0972974
Date:18.10.2000
[2000/42]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.09.2000
ClassificationInternational:F16J15/34, F01D11/00
[2000/42]
Former International [2000/03]F16J15/34
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2001/27]
Former [2000/03]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Turbomaschine mit Gleitringdichtungen[2000/03]
English:Mechanical seal for turbomachine[2000/03]
French:Garniture mécanique d'étanchéité pour turbomachine[2000/03]
Examination procedure11.04.2001Examination requested  [2001/24]
09.09.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.01.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/30]
23.02.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2004/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
02.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
31.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[A]DE19637813  (FREUDENBERG CARL FA [DE]) [A] 1 * column 3, lines 26-60 * * figure . *;
 [DA]DE4422594  (ABB PATENT GMBH [DE]) [DA] 1 * figures 1,2 *;
 [A]US4398730  (RUECKER GERHARD [DE], et al) [A] 1 * column 3, lines 15-35 * * figure 1 *;
 [A]US4578018  (POPE ADAM N [US]) [A] 1,3,4,6 * column 3, line 55 - column 4, line 22 * * figures 1,2 *;
 [A]CA2075604  (NOVA [CA]) [A] 1,3,6 * page 10, line 21 - page 11, line 33 * * page 13, line 25 - page 14, line 7 * * page 14, line 32 - page 15, line 2 * * page 15, lines 23-30 * * page 18, lines 10-30 * * figures 1-3 *;
 [A]EP0834020  (ROTOFLOW CORP [US]) [A] 1,5,6 * column 2, lines 7-20 * * claim 1 * * figures 1,2 *
by applicantDE4422594