Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0969110

EP0969110 - Hydrogen occluding alloy [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  09.08.2002
Database last updated on 13.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip09.08.2002Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 25.09.2002  [2002/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORPORATION
1-5-1, Otemachi
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORPORATION
1-5-1, Otemachi
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kita, Kouichi, c/o Mitsubishi Materials Corp.
1-5-1 Ohtemachi, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo / JP
02 / Sugahara, Katsuo, c/o Mitsubishi Materials Corp.
1-5-1 Ohtemachi, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo / JP
03 / Wada, Masahiro, c/o Mitsubishi Materials Corp.
1-5-1 Ohtemachi, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo / JP
04 / Murai, Takuya, c/o Mitsubishi Materials Corp.
1-5-1 Ohtemachi, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo / JP
05 / Isobe, Takeshi, c/o Mitsubishi Materials Corp.
1-5-1 Ohtemachi, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo / JP
[2000/01]
Representative(s)Gille Hrabal
Brucknerstrasse 20
40593 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]Türk - Gille - Hrabal - Struck
Patentanwälte - European Patent Attorneys, Brucknerstrasse 20
40593 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date99111188.109.06.1999
[2000/01]
Priority number, dateJP1998016812716.06.1998         Original published format: JP 16812798
[2000/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0969110
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/01]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0969110
Date:19.01.2000
[2000/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:C22C19/00, H01M4/38, C01B3/00
[2000/03]
Former International [2000/01]C22C19/00, H01M4/38
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR [2000/39]
Former [2000/01]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Wasserstoffeinlagerungslegierung[2000/01]
English:Hydrogen occluding alloy[2000/01]
French:Alliage à occlusion d'hydrogène[2000/01]
Examination procedure28.01.2000Examination requested  [2000/13]
13.11.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.03.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/39]
26.04.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2002/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.200204   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[YD]EP0806803  (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP [JP]) [YD] 1 * Claims 1 and 5 *;
 [Y]EP0751229  (SANTOKU METAL IND [JP]) [Y] 1 * Claims 1 and 5; page 5, l.5-57; Fig.1(a) *