Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0976617

EP0976617 - Support body for motor-vehicle numberplate lightning lamps [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  31.12.2004
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PT
published on 16.04.2008  [2008/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Plastal S.p.A.
Via Giardini Cattaneo 4
33170 Pordenone / IT
[2002/22]
Former [2001/40]For all designated states
Sapa Autoplastics S.p.A.
Via Giardini Cattaneo 3
33170 Pordenone / IT
Former [2000/05]For all designated states
PLASTAL - ZCP S.p.A.
Via Giardini Cattaneo 3
33170 Pordenone / IT
Inventor(s)01 / Garbet, Giovanni
Via del Poggio, 27
31015 Conegliano, Treviso / IT
[2000/05]
Representative(s)Giugni, Valter , et al
Propria S.r.l. Via della Colonna 35
33170 Pordenone / IT
[N/P]
Former [2003/37]Giugni, Valter , et al
PROPRIA S.r.l., Via Mazzini 13
33170 Pordenone / IT
Former [2000/05]Busca, Luciano , et al
PROPRIA S.r.l. Via Mazzini 13
33170 Pordenone / IT
Application number, filing date99111189.909.06.1999
[2000/05]
Priority number, dateIT1998PN0004027.07.1998         Original published format: IT PN980040
[2000/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0976617
Date:02.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0976617
Date:25.02.2004
Language:EN
[2004/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:B60R13/10, B60Q1/56
[2000/05]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   PT,   SE [2000/41]
Former [2000/05]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Stützkörper für Beleuchtungslampen von Kraftfahrzeugkennzeichen-Schildern[2000/05]
English:Support body for motor-vehicle numberplate lightning lamps[2000/05]
French:Corps de soutien pour lampes d'éclairage de plaque minéralogiques des automobiles[2000/05]
Examination procedure13.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/32]
03.08.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
17.11.2000Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) NL
15.05.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.08.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.09.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.12.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.08.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.11.2003Fee for grant paid
18.11.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.11.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2005/07]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
14.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
07.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
04.09.2000NL   M01   Not yet paid
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR25.02.2004
PT25.07.2004
[2008/16]
Former [2006/14]FR25.02.2004
Documents cited:Search[XA]US5521799  (VERKAMP KEVIN M [US]) [X] 1,3-6 * figures 1-16 * [A] 2,7;
 [A]US5027262  (FREED HERBERT D [US]) [A] 1-7 * figures 1-9B *;
 [A]EP0079728  (CLEARPLAS LTD [GB]) [A] 1-7 * figures 1-6 *;
 [A]DE19624789  (HELLA KG HUECK & CO [DE]) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4521838  (AGABEKOV YOURI [CH]) [A] 1-7 * figures 1-6 *