Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0980997

EP0980997 - Pressure control valve [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.10.2006
Database last updated on 17.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.11.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FR
published on 31.12.2008  [2009/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION
3044 West Grand Boulevard Detroit
Michigan 48202 / US
[N/P]
Former [2005/49]For all designated states
GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION
3044 West Grand Boulevard Detroit
Michigan 48202 / US
Former [2000/08]For all designated states
GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION
3044 West Grand Boulevard
Detroit Michigan 48202 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Long, Charles Francis
237 Fawn Court
Pittsboro, Indiana 46167 / US
02 / Dadel, Martin Robert
7319 West Woodstream Drive
Indianapolis, Indiana 46254 / US
03 / Cole, Jeffrey Jay
546 Weesner Drive
Plainfield, Indiana 46168 / US
[2000/08]
Representative(s)Manitz Finsterwald Patentanwälte PartmbB
Postfach 31 02 20
80102 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/29]Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR
Postfach 31 02 20
80102 München / DE
Former [2000/08]Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner
Postfach 22 16 11
80506 München / DE
Application number, filing date99111210.308.06.1999
[2000/08]
Priority number, dateUS1998013575718.08.1998         Original published format: US 135757
[2000/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0980997
Date:23.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/08]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0980997
Date:22.05.2002
[2002/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0980997
Date:07.12.2005
Language:EN
[2005/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.04.2002
ClassificationInternational:F16H61/06
[2000/08]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2003/07]
Former [2000/08]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Druckregelventil[2000/08]
English:Pressure control valve[2000/08]
French:Soupape à réglage de pression[2000/08]
Examination procedure25.09.2002Examination requested  [2002/51]
07.03.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.07.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.10.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.01.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.05.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.10.2005Fee for grant paid
06.10.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)08.09.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/46]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
17.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
16.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
30.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
30.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR07.12.2005
IT07.12.2005
GB08.06.2006
[2009/01]
Former [2008/16]IT07.12.2005
GB08.06.2006
Former [2007/30]GB08.06.2006
Documents cited:Search[DA]EP0768481  (GEN MOTORS CORP [US]) [DA] 1-4 * column 3, line 48 - column 4, line 20; figure 2A *;
 [A]US3587354  (OGUMA TOMIO, et al) [A] 1-4 * column 1, line 16 - line 41; figures 1,2 *;
 [PA]DE19820389  (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [PA] 1-4 * the whole document *
by applicantUS5601506
 US5616093
 US4070927