Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0969572

EP0969572 - Electrical connector [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  28.06.2002
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip13.06.2008Change - representativepublished on 16.07.2008  [2008/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Delphi Technologies, Inc.
PO Box 5052
Troy, MI 48007 / US
[2000/01]
Inventor(s)01 / Koch, Robert
Otto-Zur-Linde-Strasse 16
40474 Düsseldorf / DE
02 / Kremkus, Gregor
Im Knierer Strasse 9
42551 Velbert / DE
03 / Sikora, Andreas
Sievekingstrasse 9
58099 Hagen / DE
[2000/01]
Representative(s)Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Postfach 31 02 20
80102 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/29]Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR
Postfach 31 02 20
80102 München / DE
Former [2000/01]Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner
Postfach 22 16 11
80506 München / DE
Application number, filing date99111236.809.06.1999
[2000/01]
Priority number, dateDE1998102896829.06.1998         Original published format: DE 19828968
[2000/01]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0969572
Date:05.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/01]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0969572
Date:24.01.2001
[2001/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.12.2000
ClassificationInternational:H01R31/08, H01R13/703, H01R13/627
[2001/04]
Former International [2000/01]H01R31/08
Designated contracting states[2001/41]
Former [2000/01]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Elektrischer Steckverbinder[2000/01]
English:Electrical connector[2000/01]
French:Connecteur électrique[2000/01]
Examination procedure25.07.2001Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/33]
21.12.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2002/33]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
04.10.2001AT   M01   Not yet paid
04.10.2001BE   M01   Not yet paid
04.10.2001CH   M01   Not yet paid
04.10.2001CY   M01   Not yet paid
04.10.2001DE   M01   Not yet paid
04.10.2001DK   M01   Not yet paid
04.10.2001ES   M01   Not yet paid
04.10.2001FI   M01   Not yet paid
04.10.2001FR   M01   Not yet paid
04.10.2001GB   M01   Not yet paid
04.10.2001GR   M01   Not yet paid
04.10.2001IE   M01   Not yet paid
04.10.2001IT   M01   Not yet paid
04.10.2001LU   M01   Not yet paid
04.10.2001MC   M01   Not yet paid
04.10.2001NL   M01   Not yet paid
04.10.2001PT   M01   Not yet paid
04.10.2001SE   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
04.10.2001M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.200103   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]US5672073  (MATSUMURA NORIO ET AL) [A] 1-3,6,11-14 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0622869  (SUMITOMO WIRING SYSTEMS) [A] 1 * figures 5,7 *;
 [A]US5466168  (LIEBICH ERNST ET AL) [A] 1-6,8,9 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0758806  (SUMITOMO WIRING SYSTEMS) [A] 1,6-8,11 * abstract *;
 [A]US4152041  (HOLLYDAY ROBERT D ET AL) [A] 1 * abstract *