Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0986108

EP0986108 - Solar cell [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  20.07.2001
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip20.07.2001Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 05.09.2001 [2001/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/11]For all designated states
HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1-1, 2-chome Minami-Aoyama
Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Inaba, Atsushi
c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Honda Gijutsu Kenkyujyo
1-4-1 Chuo, Wako-shi, Saitama-ken / JP
02 / Takabe, Katsuhiko
c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Honda Gijutsu Kenkyujyo
1-4-1 Chuo, Wako-shi, Saitama-ken / JP
03 / Ishikawa, Yamato
c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Honda Gijutsu Kenkyujyo
1-4-1 Chuo, Wako-shi, Saitama-ken / JP
[2000/11]
Representative(s)Prechtel, Jörg , et al
Weickmann & Weickmann
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Postfach 860 820
81635 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/11]Prechtel, Jörg, Dipl.-Phys. Dr. , et al
Patentanwälte H. Weickmann, Dr. K. Fincke F.A. Weickmann, B. Huber Dr. H. Liska, Dr. J. Prechtel, Dr. B. Böhm Postfach 86 08 20
81635 München / DE
Application number, filing date99111434.911.06.1999
[2000/11]
Priority number, dateJP1998026896207.09.1998         Original published format: JP 26896298
[2000/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0986108
Date:15.03.2000
Language:EN
[2000/11]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP14.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:H01L31/0392, H01L31/0224, H01L31/0336
[2000/11]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/47]
Former [2000/11]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Solarzelle[2000/11]
English:Solar cell[2000/11]
French:Cellule solaire[2000/11]
Examination procedure17.05.2000Examination requested  [2000/28]
16.08.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.12.2000Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2001/36]
04.04.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2001/36]
Documents cited:Search[X]US5626686  (YOSHIDA TAKASHI [JP]) [X] 1,5 * column 1, line 55 - column 6, line 49; figures 1-6 *;
 [X]US5421908  (YOSHIDA TAKASHI [JP], et al) [X] 1 * column 9, line 43 - column 11, line 10; figures 9A-10B *;
 [Y]US5730852  (BHATTACHARYA RAGHU N [US], et al) [Y] 1-6 * the whole document *;
 [Y]JPH05315631  ;
 [A]JPS63119587
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940225), vol. 018, no. 120, Database accession no. (E - 1516), [Y] 1-6 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880930), vol. 012, no. 367, Database accession no. (E - 664), [A] 1 * abstract *