EP0969092 - Rice gene resistant to blast disease [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.08.2005 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NATIONAL INSTITUTE OF AGROBIOLOGICAL SCIENCES 2-1-2, Kannondai Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 305-8602 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/17] | For all designated states National Institute of Agrobiological Sciences 2-1-2, Kannondai Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-8602 / JP | ||
Former [2001/43] | For all designated states National Institute of Agrobiological Sciences 2-1-2 Kannondai Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-8602 / JP | ||
Former [2000/01] | For all designated states Japan as represented by Dir. Gen. of National Inst. of Agrobiological Resources, Ministry of Agriculture, Forestry and Fisherie 2-1-2, Kannondai Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-8602 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yano, Masahiro c/o Nat.Inst.of Agrob.Res. Min.of Agric., For.and Fish., 2-1-2 Kannondai Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-8602 / JP | 02 /
Iwamoto, Masao c/o Nat.Inst.of Agrob. Res. Min.of Agric., For.and Fish., 2-1-2, Kannondai Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-8602 / JP | 03 /
Katayose, Yuichi c/o Nat.Inst.of Agrob.Res. Min.of Agric., For. and Fish., 2-1-2 Kannondai Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-8602 / JP | 04 /
Sasaki, Takuji c/o Nat. Inst. of Agrob. Res. Min. of Agric., For. and Fish., 2-1-2, Kannondai Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-8602 / JP | 05 /
Wang, Zi-Xuan/Soc.for Techno-Inn.of Agric.For.Fish 446-1, Ippaizuka, Kamiyokoba, Tsukuba-shi . Ibaraki 305-0854 / JP | 06 /
Yamanouchi, Utako/Soc.Techn.-Inn.Agric.For.Fish. 446-1, Ippaizuka, Kamiyokoba, Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 305-0854 / JP | 07 /
Ishimaru, Lisa/Soc.Techn.-Inn.Agric., For.Fish. 446-1, Ippaizuka, Kamiyokoba, Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 305-0854 / JP | [2000/01] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/01] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99111443.0 | 11.06.1999 | [2000/01] | Priority number, date | JP19980181455 | 12.06.1998 Original published format: JP 18145598 | [2000/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0969092 | Date: | 05.01.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0969092 | Date: | 13.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/29, C07K14/415, C12N5/04, C07K16/16 | [2000/01] | CPC: |
C07K14/415 (EP,US);
A01H5/00 (KR);
C12N15/11 (KR);
C12N15/8282 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [2000/37] |
Former [2000/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Reisgen resistent gegen Reisbrand | [2000/01] | English: | Rice gene resistant to blast disease | [2000/01] | French: | Gène de riz résistant à la rouille du riz | [2000/01] | Examination procedure | 28.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/17] | 15.11.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.03.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.2003 | Date of oral proceedings | 02.02.2004 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 15.03.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.07.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 26.07.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9705165 (DJAVAKHIA VITALI [RU], et al) [A] 1-4,6 * page 14, line 10 - page 15 * * page 19 * * page 20; claims 1-3,9,10,12,16,17 *; | [A]US5674993 (KAWASAKI SHINJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-4,12 * figures 1,2,5,6; claim - *; | [A] - NAKAMURA ET AL., "Construction of an 800-kb contig in the near-centromeric region of the rice blast resistance gene Pi-ta2 using a highly representative rice BAC library", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19970929), vol. 127, no. 13, Database accession no. 171978v, page 133, column 1, XP002900641 [A] 1-10 * abstract * | [ ] - MOL. GEN. GENETIC., (1997), vol. 254, no. 6, pages 611 - 620 | [A] - ASAO ET AL., "Enhanced resistance against a fungal pathogen Sphaerotheca humuli in transgenic strawberry expressing a rice chitinase gene", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19980202), vol. 128, no. 5, Database accession no. 44388y, page 148, column 1, XP002900642 [A] 1-4 * abstract * | [ ] - PLANT BIOTECHNOL., Tokyo, (1997), vol. 14, no. 3, pages 145 - 149 | Examination | - MONNA L. ET AL, "Saturation mapping with subclones of YACs: DNA marker production targeting the rice blast disease resistance gene Pi-b", THEOR APPL GENET, (1997), vol. 94, no. 2, pages 170 - 176 | - YOSHIMURA S. ET AL, "Expression of Xa1, a bacterial blight-resistance gene in rice, is induced by bacterial inoculation", PROC. NATL. ACAD.SCI. USA, (199802), vol. 95, pages 1663 - 1668 |