Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0965449

EP0965449 - Wedge ink duct [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.06.2003
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.06.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 06.08.2003  [2003/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Koenig & Bauer Aktiengesellschaft
Friedrich-Koenig-Strasse 4
97080 Würzburg / DE
[1999/51]
Inventor(s)01 / Thieme, Torsten
Hoflössnitzstrasse 80
01445 Radebeul / DE
[1999/51]
Application number, filing date99111469.512.06.1999
[1999/51]
Priority number, dateDE199812681716.06.1998         Original published format: DE 19826817
[1999/51]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0965449
Date:22.12.1999
Language:DE
[1999/51]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0965449
Date:05.04.2000
[2000/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0965449
Date:14.08.2002
Language:DE
[2002/33]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:B41F31/04, B41F31/08
[1999/51]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/50]
Former [1999/51]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Keilfarbkasten[1999/51]
English:Wedge ink duct[1999/51]
French:Bac d'encrage à coins[1999/51]
Examination procedure06.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/19]
27.11.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.04.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.07.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
16.08.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.01.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
01.02.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.02.2002Fee for grant paid
07.02.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.05.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
11.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[YD]DE4339939  (WAGNER ROBERT [DE]) [YD] 1-5 * siehe Zusammenfassung; column 2, line 6 - column 5, line 6; figures 1-5 *;
 [Y]DE19640775  (ROLAND MAN DRUCKMASCH [DE]) [Y] 1-5 * siehe Zusammenfassung; column 1, line 42 - column 4, line 6; figures 1-8 *;
 [Y]DE2816881  (HARRIS CORP) [Y] 3 * page 20, line 4 - page 27, line L; figures 1-8 *;
 [A]DE1944832U  (KOPPERS CO INC [US]) [A] 1-5 * page 1, line 1 - page 5, line L; figures 1-5 *;
 [A]EP0022912  (ROLAND MAN DRUCKMASCH [DE]) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *;
 [A]CH649954  (WIFAG MASCHF) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *