Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0965447

EP0965447 - Ink fountain with an automatic ink supply [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.10.2003
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip24.10.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 10.12.2003  [2003/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Koenig & Bauer Aktiengesellschaft
Friedrich-Koenig-Strasse 4
97080 Würzburg / DE
[1999/51]
Inventor(s)01 / Becker, Uwe Dipl.-Ing.
Kötitzer Strasse 85
01445 Radebeul / DE
[1999/51]
Application number, filing date99111470.312.06.1999
[1999/51]
Priority number, dateDE199812681816.06.1998         Original published format: DE 19826818
[1999/51]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0965447
Date:22.12.1999
Language:DE
[1999/51]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0965447
Date:05.04.2000
[2000/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0965447
Date:18.12.2002
Language:DE
[2002/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:B41F31/02, B41F31/08
[2000/14]
Former International [1999/51]B41F31/02
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/50]
Former [1999/51]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Farbkasten mit automatischer Farbversorgung[1999/51]
English:Ink fountain with an automatic ink supply[1999/51]
French:Bac à encre avec une amenée de l'encre automatique[1999/51]
Examination procedure06.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/19]
27.11.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.04.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.07.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
16.08.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.03.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
27.03.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.04.2002Fee for grant paid
04.04.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.09.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
11.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[YD]DE4339939  (WAGNER ROBERT [DE]) [YD] 1-5 * siehe Zusammenfassung; column 1, line 1 - column 4, line 66; figures 1-5 *;
 [Y]US5170710  (HARPOLD CHARLES W [US], et al) [Y] 1-5 * siehe Zusammenfassung; column 1, line 7 - column 5, line 37; figures 1-9 *;
 [Y]DE2816881  (HARRIS CORP) [Y] 4 * page 8, line 1 - page 22, paragraph 3; figures 1-13 *;
 [A]DE19640775  (ROLAND MAN DRUCKMASCH [DE]) [A] 2-5 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9814330  (ACCEL GRAPHICS SYSTEMS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *;
 [AD]EP0459755  (BALDWIN TECHNOLOGY CORP [US]) [AD] 1-5 * the whole document *