Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0974979

EP0974979 - Articles of functional fluoropolymer [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.12.2007
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.06.2008Change - applicantpublished on 23.07.2008  [2008/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company
1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19898 / US
[N/P]
Former [2008/30]For all designated states
E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY
1007 Market Street
Wilmington DE 19898 / US
Former [2007/08]For all designated states
E.I. DUPONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY
1007 Market Street Wilmington
Delaware 19898 / US
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
E.I. DUPONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY
1007 Market Street
Wilmington, Delaware 19898 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Spohn, Peter Dwight
P.O.Box 591
Jaffrey, NH 03452 / US
[2000/04]
Representative(s)Matthews, Derek Peter
Dehns
St Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]Matthews, Derek Peter
Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street
London EC4V 4EL / GB
Application number, filing date99111485.114.06.1999
[2000/04]
Priority number, dateUS19980091139P28.06.1998         Original published format: US 91139 P
US1999031770724.05.1999         Original published format: US 317707
[2000/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0974979
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/04]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0974979
Date:19.07.2000
[2000/29]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0974979
Date:21.02.2007
Language:EN
[2007/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.06.2000
ClassificationInternational:H01B3/44, F16L9/12, F16L11/04, C08L27/12, C08L51/00
[2000/04]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2001/13]
Former [2000/04]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Gegenstände aus funktionellem Fluorpolymer[2000/04]
English:Articles of functional fluoropolymer[2000/04]
French:Articles fabriqués de polymère fonctionnel[2000/04]
Examination procedure10.01.2001Examination requested  [2001/11]
05.08.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.02.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.03.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.01.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.02.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.09.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.09.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
08.07.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
16.09.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.04.2006Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 10.05.2006
28.04.2006Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
04.05.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
10.05.2006Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
20.06.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.08.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.01.2007Fee for grant paid
02.01.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)22.11.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2008/05]
Request for further processing for:16.09.2005Request for further processing filed
16.09.2005Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
30.09.2005Decision despatched
14.01.2004Request for further processing filed
14.01.2004Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
02.02.2004Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
12.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
12.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
14.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
14.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
14.06.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:SearchJPH08157684  [ ] (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD);
 JPH02216704  [ ] (HITACHI CABLE);
 JPH0741563  [ ] (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD);
 [PX]EP0906934  (AUSIMONT SPA [IT]) [PX] 1-8 * example 6; claim - *;
 [DX]EP0761757  (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP]) [DX] 1-8 * page 6, line 54 - line 59; example -; claim - *;
 [DX]EP0650987  (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP]) [DX] 1-8 * examples 1-3,9,11-13; claim - *;
 [DX]WO9603448  (DU PONT [US]) [DX] 1-8 * page 5, line 16 - line 17 * * page 8, line 31 - page 9, line 25; example 14 *
 [X]  - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19961014), vol. 125, no. 16, Database accession no. 197477, XP002117310 [X] 1-8 * abstract *
 [X]  - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19910603), vol. 114, no. 22, Database accession no. 209311, XP002117311 [X] 1-8 * abstract *
 [X]  - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19950821), vol. 123, no. 8, Database accession no. 85311, XP002117312 [X] 1-8 * abstract *