Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0994135

EP0994135 - Process for the preparation of thermally stable polyoxymethylene copolymers [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.07.2003
Database last updated on 15.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.07.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 10.09.2003  [2003/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ticona GmbH
Professor-Staudinger-Strasse
65451 Kelsterbach / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/37]For all designated states
Ticona GmbH
Professor-Staudinger-strasse
65451 Kelsterbach / DE
Former [2000/16]For all designated states
Ticona GmbH
An der B 53
65451 Kelsterbach / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Gronner, Robert, Dr.
4717 Willowick Drive
Corpus Christi, Nueces, TX / US
02 / Mück, Karl-Friedrich, Dr.
Schnitterweg 7
65207 Wiesbaden / DE
03 / Röschert, Horst, Dr.
Am Pfingstborn 16
55437 Ober-Hilbersheim / DE
04 / Verma, Satyajit, Dr.
6814 Whitewing Drive
Corpus Christi, TX / US
05 / Yearwood, Michael
209 East 16th Street
Bishop, Nueces, TX / US
[2000/16]
Application number, filing date99111489.314.06.1999
[2000/16]
Priority number, dateUS1998014979508.09.1998         Original published format: US 149795
[2000/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0994135
Date:19.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0994135
Date:18.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:C08G2/06, C08G2/18
[2000/16]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [2000/52]
Former [2000/16]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung von wärmestabilen Polyoxymethylencopolymeren[2000/16]
English:Process for the preparation of thermally stable polyoxymethylene copolymers[2000/16]
French:Procédé de préparation de copolymères de polyoxyméthylène thermostables[2000/16]
Examination procedure19.10.2000Examination requested  [2000/50]
07.08.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
12.12.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
05.02.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.05.2002Fee for grant paid
15.05.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP01128029.4  / EP1186620
Opposition(s)19.06.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
01.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0080656  (BASF AG [DE]) [A] 1-8 * page 2, line 24 - page 3, line 7; claims 1-4 *;
 [A]EP0347119  (POLYPLASTICS CO [JP]) [A] 1-8 * page 3, line 37 - line 40; claims 1-10 *;
 [A]DE3147757  (INST CHEMII PRZEMYSLOWEJ [PL]) [A] 1-8 * example 1; claims 1-3 *