Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0974309

EP0974309 - Applicator [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.06.2012
Database last updated on 22.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.06.2012No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 18.07.2012  [2012/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ivoclar Vivadent AG
Bendererstrasse 2
9494 Schaan / LI
[2001/15]
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
IVOCLAR AG
Bendererstrasse 2
9494 Schaan / LI
Inventor(s)01 / Winkler, Siegbert
Feldweg 34
6800 Tisis/Feldkirch / AT
[2000/04]
Representative(s)Baronetzky, Klaus , et al
Splanemann
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft
Rumfordstrasse 7
80469 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]Baronetzky, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. R. Splanemann, Dr. B. Reitzner, Dipl.-Ing. K. Baronetzky Tal 13
80331 München / DE
Application number, filing date99111506.414.06.1999
[2000/04]
Priority number, dateDE199813323823.07.1998         Original published format: DE 19833238
[2000/04]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0974309
Date:26.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/04]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0974309
Date:11.09.2002
[2002/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0974309
Date:10.08.2011
Language:DE
[2011/32]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.07.2002
ClassificationInternational:A61C5/06, A61C9/00, B05C17/01
[2002/37]
Former International [2000/04]A61C5/06
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   SE [2003/22]
Former [2000/04]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Applikator[2000/04]
English:Applicator[2000/04]
French:Applicateur[2000/04]
Examination procedure26.09.2002Examination requested  [2002/48]
07.06.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.10.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.08.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.12.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.02.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.05.2011Fee for grant paid
26.05.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  07.06.2005
Opposition(s)11.05.2012No opposition filed within time limit [2012/29]
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
24.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
25.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
24.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
26.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
24.06.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
26.06.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
26.06.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
29.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 11
28.06.2010Renewal fee patent year 12
30.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 13
Lapses during opposition  TooltipSE10.08.2011
[2012/10]
Documents cited:Search[A]FR1217497  (DUGINI GUSTAVE) [A] 1,4 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4269331  (WATSON JOHN D) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4560352  (NEUEMEISTER ALEXANDER [DE], et al) [A] 1,2,11,14 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4479781  (HEROLD WOLF-DIETRICH [DE], et al) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *
by applicantDE2741185