Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0990396

EP0990396 - Snowboard boot ankle and heel support [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.08.2004
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.08.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 29.09.2004  [2004/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SHIMANO INC.
77, 3-cho Oimatsu-cho Sakai-shi
Osaka / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/14]For all designated states
SHIMANO INC.
77, 3-cho Oimatsu-cho Sakai-shi
Osaka / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Shinpei, Okajima
3-2-16, Midorigaoka
Izumi-shi, Osaka / JP
[2000/14]
Representative(s)Herrmann-Trentepohl, Werner
Grosse Bockhorni Schumacher
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Elsenheimerstrasse 49
80687 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/14]Herrmann-Trentepohl, Werner, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwälte Herrmann-Trentepohl Grosse - Bockhorni & Partner Forstenrieder Allee 59
81476 München / DE
Application number, filing date99111533.814.06.1999
[2000/14]
Priority number, dateUS1998012791303.08.1998         Original published format: US 127913
[2000/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0990396
Date:05.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0990396
Date:08.10.2003
Language:EN
[2003/41]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:A43B7/20, A43B5/04, A43B5/00
[2000/14]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   LI,   SE [2000/50]
Former [2000/14]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Gelenk- und Fersenstütze für Snowboardstiefel[2000/14]
English:Snowboard boot ankle and heel support[2000/14]
French:Support de cheville et de talon pour chaussure de surf des neiges[2000/14]
Examination procedure21.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/34]
06.10.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
19.01.2001Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CY, DK, ES, FI, GB, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT
03.09.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.03.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.03.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.06.2003Fee for grant paid
24.06.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)09.07.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
26.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
26.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
10.11.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
10.11.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
10.11.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
10.11.2000DE   M01   Not yet paid
10.11.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
10.11.2000ES   M01   Not yet paid
10.11.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
10.11.2000GB   M01   Not yet paid
10.11.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
10.11.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
10.11.2000IT   M01   Not yet paid
10.11.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
10.11.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
10.11.2000NL   M01   Not yet paid
10.11.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCH08.10.2003
LI08.10.2003
SE08.01.2004
[2004/33]
Former [2004/24]SE08.01.2004
Documents cited:Search[A]US5678330  (VAN DYKE MARK W [US], et al) [A] 1,4 * column W *;
 [A]US4811500  (MACCANO ANGELO [US]) [A] 1,4 * column W *;
 [A]US5269078  (COCHRANE CHARLES R [US]) [A] 1,4 * column W *;
 [A]EP0521287  (SALOMON SA [FR]) [A] 1,4 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5761835  (OKAJIMA SHINPEI [JP]) [A] 1,4 * column W *